This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 15:34:19 (UTC).

ANTONELLI VS ROSALES

Case Summary

On 09/07/2012 ANTONELLI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROSALES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Friedman, Gary T.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7586

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Friedman, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTONELLI, TIMOTHY

Defendants

ROSALES, I

CONTRERAS, M

HILDEBRAND, M

GALVAN, M

GARZA, J

STOCKMAN, P

GALVAN, M.

HILDEBRAND, M.

ROSALES, I.

CONTRERAS, M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

CHINN, DIANA N

MATHISON, JAMES D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2014
  • DocketNotice of Filing Remittitur - Comment: Mailed to parties as stated on declaration of mailing at bottom of page.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • DocketRemittitur on Appeal After Dismissal - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketOrder - Comment: THE APPEAL IN THE ABOVE-ENTITLED ACTION IS DISMISSED PURSUANT TO SAID RULE 8.140(B)(1).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • Docket839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 - Comment: Amount of $6.00 for ROSALES, I. (DE-1). Received from ROSALES. Receipt #800439 for amount of $6.00. Detail: FAX ID: 18695.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • Docket839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 - Comment: Amount of $5.00 for ROSALES, I. (DE-1). Received from ROSALES. Receipt #800438 for amount of $5.00. Detail: FAX ID: 18696.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • Docket839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 - Comment: Amount of $4.00 for ROSALES, I. (DE-1). Received from DIANA N. CHINN. Receipt #798294 for amount of $4.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • Docket839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 - Comment: Amount of $4.00 for ROSALES, I. (DE-1). Received from DIANA N. CHINN. Receipt #798293 for amount of $4.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • Docket839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 - Comment: Amount of $6.00 for ROSALES, I. (DE-1). Received from DIANA N. CHINN. Receipt #798290 for amount of $6.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • Docket839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 - Comment: Amount of $4.00 for ROSALES, I. (DE-1). Received from DIANA N CHINN. Receipt #798277 for amount of $4.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • Docket839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 - Comment: Amount of $4.00 for ROSALES, I. (DE-1). Received from DIANA N CHINN. Receipt #798275 for amount of $4.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
134 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2012
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: RE: TIMOTHY ANTONELLI COURTCALL CONFIRMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketFacsimile Transmission Cover Sheet - Comment: ORDER DIRECTED TO BRIAN SNIDER OR CURRENT LITIGATION COORDINATOR RE: ORDER FOR COURT CALL APPEARANCE FOR PLAINTIFF TIMOTHY ANTONELLI RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR 12/21/12 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 4 (COPY OF COURT CALL CONFIRMATION MAILED TO PLAINTIFF IN PRO PER ON 9/19/12)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • DocketNotice / Assign / Status / JES - Comment: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P CHAPIN FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 4 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "SPC" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P CHAPIN ON Mar 06, 2013 AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 4 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet, Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P CHAPIN FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 4 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "SPC" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P CHAPIN ON Mar 06, 2013 AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 4 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet, Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Dec 21, 2012 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Dec 21, 2012 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • DocketCertificate of Service - Comment: MAILED COPY OF ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER TO TIMOTHY ANTONELLI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: GRANTED IN WHOLE AS TO TIMOTHY ANTONELLI SIGNED BY JUDGE CHAPIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • DocketComplaint - FT - Comment: IN PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: FILED BY TIMOTHY ANTONELLI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 659

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.