This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:52:15 (UTC).

ANTELOPE VALLEY INVESTMENTS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS GLENN LANZARE ONG-VELOSO, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA ASPEN DENTAL GROUP, AND DBA GLENN ONG-VELOSO, A DENTAL CORPORATION, AND DBA GLENN ONG-VELOSO, DDS ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 ANTELOPE VALLEY INVESTMENTS, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GLENN LANZARE ONG-VELOSO, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA ASPEN DENTAL GROUP, AND DBA GLENN ONG-VELOSO, A DENTAL CORPORATION, AND DBA GLENN ONG-VELOSO, DDS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Etienne, Linda S., Holladay, Brandon and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0606

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Etienne, Linda S.

Holladay, Brandon

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANTELOPE VALLEY INVESTMENTS, INC.

ANTELOPE VALLEY INVESTMENTS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

GLENN ONG-VELOSO, A DENTAL CORPORATION

ONG-VELOSO, GLENN LANZAR

ASPEN DENTAL GROUP, GLENN ONG-VELOSO, A DENTAL CORPORATION

ONG-VELOSO, GLENN

GLENN LANZARE ONG-VELOSO, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA ASPEN DENTAL GROUP, AND DBA GLENN ONG-VELOSO, A DENTAL CORPORATION, AND DBA GLENN ONG-VELOSO, DDS

GLENN ONG-VELOSO, A DENTAL CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA ASPEN DENTAL GROUP

GLENN ONG-VELOSO, A DENTAL CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDSGAARD, OLAF A

Defendant Attorney

REYMANN, JONATHAN M

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 11/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: LANDSGAARD, OLAF A; Defendant; Attorney: REYMANN, JONATHAN M; Defendant; Attorney: REYMANN, JONATHAN M

Demurrer First Amended Complaint

Demurrer First Amended Complaint 08/11/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/12/17 Defendants, GLENN ONG-VELOSO and GLENN ONG-VELOSO, A DENTAL CORPORATION Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ResID: 25215

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) 04/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: REYMANN, JONATHAN M; Defendant; Attorney: REYMANN, JONATHAN M

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: $435.00 required for each defendant filing demurrer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: FCMC 09/17/18; JURY TRIAL 09/17/18; T/E 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice on complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability of Counsel - Comment: 1. June 9,2018 through June 18, 2018; 2. July 23, 2018 through July 27, 2018; 3. August 6, 2018 through August 10, 2018; 4. August 30, 2018 through September 3, 2018; and 5. November 19, 2018 through November 27, 2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 11/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: AS TO NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: AS TO NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ANTELOPE VALLEY INVESTMENTS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Served: 05/09/2017; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 21007 NEMOPHILA CALIFORNIA CITY, CA 93505 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.