This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 22:41:42 (UTC).

ANNABELLE DIARTE, A MINOR ET AL VS BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/10/2016 ANNABELLE DIARTE, A MINOR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Lampe, David R., Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1034

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JESSICA FONSECA (AKA JESSICA FONSECA CHAVEZ), A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, CLAUDIA CHAVEZ

AALIYAH NAYELI DIARTE, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM KARINA CHAVEZ

LEONARDO DIARTE, JR., A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM KARINA CHAVEZ

ANNABELLE DIARTE, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM KARINA CHAVEZ

THE ESTATE OF LEONARDO DIARTE

FOSTER, JANET

BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEONARDO DIARTE, JR., A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, KARINA CHAVEZ

CHAVEZ, CLAUDIA

RIVERA, ROSA

JADA HAMILTON, A MINOR

ANABELLE DIARTE, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, KARINA CHAVEZ

ESTATE OF LEONARDO DIARTE

GRACIELA GOMEZ , A MINOR

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

JANET ELAINE FOSTER, AN INDIVIDUAL

KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDANT OF SCHOOLS, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

FOSTER, JANET

KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS

BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT

FOSTER, JANET ELAINE

KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

ESTATE OF LEONARDO DIARTE

Cross Defendant and Guardian Ad Litem

CHAVEZ, CLAUDIA

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FINE, MICKEY L

PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

HERR, LEONARD C

WELLS, DAVID J

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

WELLS, DAVID J

HERR, LEONARD C.

 

Court Documents

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 01/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (CONT'D FROM 10/16/17); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER. LEAD CASE NUMBER IS NOT LISTED FIRST.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ANSWER. Herr Pedersen & Berglund have previously filed an answer for Cross-Defendant Bakersfield City School District on 10/3/17.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER. TITLE, CAPTION & BODY DOES NOT CONFORM.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion to Compel -- Motion is filed but not calendared, no reservation

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 08/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/10/2017 CROSS-DEFENDANT, ESTATE OF LEONARDO DIARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Cross Defendant; Attorney: WELLS, DAVID J; Attorney: WELLS, DAVID J; Cross Defendant; Attorney: WELLS, DAVID J; Cross Complainant; Attorney: WELLS, DAVID J

Further Case Management Conference

01/13/2017 Minute Order: Further Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH BCV-16-101240 WITH BCV-16-101034 BEING THE LEAD CASE. Cont'd from 11/29/16; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Defendant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C

Motion to Consolidate

Motion to Consolidate 10/25/2016: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: w/BCV-16-101240 9/13/16 Defendants, BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT; JANET ELAINE FOSTER AND KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS Motion to Consolidate cases for all purposes ResID: 17949 ************************************************* TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION TO CO0NSOLIDATE CASE NO. 16-101240 WITH 16-101034. LEAD CASE WILL BE 16-101034SPC. A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR THE CONSOLIDATED CASES WILL BE CONDUCTED 11/29, 8:00AM, D-4. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS REQUIRED. PREVIOUSLY NOTICED CMC'S ARE CONTINUED OR VACATED. *******************************************************; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Defendant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

08/23/16 MO: Order to Show Cause re: POS 3.110: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 02/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont 01/18/18; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 01/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/24/17 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents Set Three from Defendant, Bakerfield City School District ResID: 27212

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 01/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: 12/8/17 Defendant, JANET FOSTER AND BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery from Mary Chavez and Request for Monetary Sanctions ResID: 28574; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 01/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/24/17 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents Set Two from Defendant, Bakersfield City School District ResID: 27211; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER TO CROSS- COMPLAINT. LEAD CASE NUMBER IS NOT LISTED FIRST.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: (SET PER MO 09/07/17); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Defendant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Defendant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Cross Defendant; Attorney: WELLS, DAVID J; Attorney: WELLS, DAVID J; Cross Defendant; Attorney: WELLS, DAVID J; Cross Complainant; Attorney: WELLS, DAVID J

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 09/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/10/17; Notice of hearing 8/22/17 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One from Defendant, Bakersfield City School District ResID: 25487 **************************************************** TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION AS TO NO. 12.2; OTHERWISE, DENY. DENY ALL APPLICATIONS FOR SANCTIONS. ******************************************************; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Defendant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Defendant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HERR, LEONARD C

Motion to Consolidate

Motion to Consolidate 09/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/10/17 Cross-Defendant, ESTATE OF LEONARDO DIARTE Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Consolidating Cases ResID: 25466 ************************************************* TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES. CASE NO. 16-101034SPC TO BE LEAD CASE. SET CMC IN CONSOLIDATED CASES FOR 10/16/17, 8:00AM, D-4. MINUTE ORDER TO ISSUE IN ALL CASES. *****************************************************; Parties Present Cross Defendant; Attorney: WELLS, DAVID J; Attorney: WELLS, DAVID J; Cross Defendant; Attorney: WELLS, DAVID J; Cross Complainant; Attorney: WELLS, DAVID J

Further Case Management Conference

11/29/16 MO; FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH 16-101240 WITH 16-101034 BEING THE LEAD CASE.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2016
  • Cause of Action: Cross-Complaint; Type: Cross Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E 15 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: TRJ 01/07/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: remaing issues: sanctions, status cont 02/15/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 02/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont 01/18/18; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E; Plaintiff; Attorney: PURCELL, CHRISTOPHER E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 10/24/17 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents Set Three from Defendant, Bakerfield City School District ResID: 27212

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF LEONARD C. HERR, ESQ. IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET TWO, FROM DEFENDANT, BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT, AND FOR SANCTIONS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Letter Received - Comment: Letter to take Motion OFF calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Notice of Motion - Comment: Motion to Quash

    Read MoreRead Less
135 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Application & Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: Karina Chavez is appointed as guardian ad litem for Annabelle Diarte

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Application & Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: Karina Chavez is appointed as guardian ad litem for Leonardo Diarte, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Application & Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: Karina Chavez is appointed as guardian ad litem for Aaliyah Nayeli Diarte

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Application & Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: Claudia Chavez is appointed as guardian ad litem for Jessica Fonseca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/23/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Jubin Sharifi, Esq. (SBN 213806) Jason Adams Frost, Esq. (SBN 199852) SHARIFI FIRM. PLC

11150 West Olympic Boulevard, Suite 1080

Los Angcles, California 90064 Tclephone: (323) 848-9904 Facsimile: (323) 848-9905

Attorney for Plaintiff

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF KERN

MARY CHAVEZ; STEPHANIE BADILLO;

Plaintiffs, Vs,

LEONARDO DIARTE; JANET FOSTER;

BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL

DISTRICT, and DOES 1 TO 50 Defendants.

AND CONSOLIDATED ACTIONS.

Sagt’ gt gyt ot o’ “mat’

Case No.: BCV-16-101240 (consolidated with lead casc BCV-16-101034, BCV-17-100803 and BCV-17-100857)

ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO:

DEPT 4 MARY CHAVEZ AND STEPHANIE BADILLO’S ANSWER TO CROSS- COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

COMES NOW Cross-Defendants in Interpleader Mary Chavez and Stephanic Badill

(hereinafter “‘Cross-Defendants™) and on behalf of their respective sclves answers the Cross

Complaint in intcrplcader admitting, denying and allcging as follows:

SPECIFIC ADMISSIONS AND DENIALS

1. Cross-Defendants admit the allegations contained in Paragraphs 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, and 10.

2. Cross-Defendants have no information upon which to plead and accordingly deny the

allegations containcd in Paragraphs 6, 7 and 9.