This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 19:02:37 (UTC).

ANINION VS STUART

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 ANINION filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against STUART. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Bradshaw, J. Eric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2288

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Bradshaw, J. Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CANUTO, ANTHONY RUBEN

GUTIERREZ, DANIEL, Jr.

JIMENEZ, MERCEDES

MONCADO, RAUL

RAMIREZ, RAMON V

CASTANEDA, JOSE A

JIMENEZ, ISRAEL E

MAGDAY, NORBERTO

BAEZA, YOLANDA

RODRIGUEZ, JOSE L

ANINION, JENNIEFER

ALKORIN, ALI M

GOMEZ, FRANCISCO R

HARTFORD, MARIBEL F

TREJO, CARLOS S.

BAEZA, ELADIO

CAMPOS, JESUS

RAMIREZ, MARIA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

STUART THOMAS, INC.

LENOX HOMES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTHRIE, LORI J

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

COPPOLA, CARLO A

CONSTANTINO, MATTHEW S

Other Attorneys

DOVE, MARK S

PEZOLD, DANIEL G

BRAASCH, DEBRA L

CORRELL, DEBORAH A

RUTHERFORD, KARI L

PENDLETON, MELODY RUSSELL

BREGMAN, DAVID N

O'BRIEN, JILLISA L.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/15/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Lori J. Guthrie Re: Summons Reason: Summons do not conform with complaint, check DOES information.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons: Incomplete filing. Additional parties attachment is not attached.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proofs of Service (X2); Party served does not conform to the Complaint. Only one party can be served per POS-010. Please review.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; Second Rejection, no changes made. Party served does not conform to the Complaint.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; Second Rejection, no changes made. Only one party can be served per POS-010.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; Party served does not conform to the Complaint in its entirety. Please seek legal advice.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; 3rd Rejection. Item 3a, "LENNOX HOMES INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION" party does not conform to the Complaint. Please review Complaint.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice: Insufficent fees cannot be paid online. Please submit a check or call the clerks office and make payment over the phone.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit: Millwood Cabinet Co., Inc. paid jury deposit on 2/26/2021.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Cont'd from 04/01/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment from Judge Lampe to Judge Bradshaw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: without prejudice as to Plaintiffs Francisco R. Gomez and Patricia Gomez ONLY, all other named Plaintiffs to remain in case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Plaintiff Daniel Gutierrez Jr. Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: Joint Stipulation in Advance of October 18, 2021 Case Management Conference and Order to Continue Case Management Conference The Case Management Conference scheduled for October 18, 2021 is hereby continued to January 25, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 11 of the above-entitled court. IT IS SO ORDERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: without prejudicde as to Broken Drum of Bakersfield, Inc. Only in the Cross-complaint of Lenox Home, Inc. and Stuart Thomas, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDisassociation of Attorney - Comment: for Millwood Cabinet Co., Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit: Millwood Cabinet Co., Inc. paid jury deposit on 2/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proofs of Service (X2); Party served does not conform to the Complaint. Only one party can be served per POS-010. Please review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint - Comment: Adding additional Plaintiff - DAVID GONZALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons: Incomplete filing. Additional parties attachment is not attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/18/202011:07 AM; Served: 11/18/202011:07 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Lori J. Guthrie Re: Summons Reason: Summons do not conform with complaint, check DOES information.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/15/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STUART THOMAS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BREGMAN, DAVID N

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dove, Mark S