This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 22:48:06 (UTC).

ANGELINA S BARRIOS TRUST

Case Summary

On 04/02/2015 ANGELINA S BARRIOS TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Knight, Alisa R., Lampe, David R., Myers, Brett and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4845

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Knight, Alisa R.

Lampe, David R.

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SUPERTINO, LYNETTE YVONNE

DAVIS, MICHAEL B

MOROSA, ANGELINA CARMEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

BOWMAN, STACY H

KIND, K WARNER

KIND, K. WARNER

COX, LARRY R

HUGHES, JOSEPH D

VAN SCIVER, KURT D

 

Court Documents

Motion

Motion 10/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING Notice of Motion and Motion for new trial; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER; Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion...returned via AMS

Ruling

07/26/2017 MO: Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 06/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER; Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner: DAVIS, MICHAEL B; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 04/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - REMAINING ISSUES NOTE - 1. As of 3/23/17, no Status Conference Statements have been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER; Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Court Trial

Court Trial 01/31/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - AMENDED PETITION FOR IMMEDIATE SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE'S POWERS, REMOVAL, ACCTG & INSTRUCTION; Parties Present Petitioner: SUPERTINO, LYNETTE YVONNE; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER; Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Court Trial

Court Trial 01/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - AMENDED PETITION FOR IMMEDIATE SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE'S POWERS, REMOVAL, ACCTG & INSTRUCTION; Parties Present Petitioner: SUPERTINO, LYNETTE YVONNE; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER; Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Mandatory Settlement Conference

01/13/17 - M.O. MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - AMENDED PETITION FOR IMMEDIATE SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE'S POWERS, REMOVAL, ACCTG & INSTRUCTION; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER; Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Petition

4/28/2016MO: Petition: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - AMENDED PETITION FOR IMMEDIATE SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE'S POWERS, REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE, ACCOUNTING, AND INSTRUCTION.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D

Ruling

Ruling 12/04/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Status Conference

06/16/2017 MO: Status Conference Re: Remaining Issues: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Case Management Conference Re: Remaining Issues; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Case Status Conference

4/21/17 MO: Case Status Conference: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - REMAINING ISSUES; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER; Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D

Ruling

03/23/2017 Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Court Trial

Court Trial 02/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - AMENDED PETITION FOR IMMEDIATE SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE'S POWERS, REMOVAL, ACCTG & INSTRUCTION; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER; Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Court Trial

Court Trial 02/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - AMENDED PETITION FOR IMMEDIATE SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE'S POWERS, REMOVAL, ACCTG & INSTRUCTION; Parties Present Petitioner: SUPERTINO, LYNETTE YVONNE; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER; Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Ruling

**MO - Probate w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

Case Management Conference

MO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - AMENDED PETITION FOR IMMEDIATE SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE'S POWERS, REMOVAL, ACCTG & INSTRUCTION; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER; Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D

Motion

Motion 09/21/2016: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re stipulation on file; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KIND, K WARNER; Petitioner; Attorney: VAN SCIVER, KURT D; Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Law offices of Young & Wooldridge New Attorney:Larry R. Cox

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Filing Remittitur

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketRemittitur Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketWithdrawal From Trust Fund - Comment: Processed trust refunds as follows: $1,400 to Bowman & Kind, $884.50 to Klein Denatale Goldner Attorneys at Law (Operating Account) and $949.50 to Young Wooldridge. Completed on 06/26/18. CR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketExhibit(s) List - Comment: OBJECTOR/JOINTS/PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Filing Remittitur - Comment: prepared in error.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketOrder from Fifth District Court of Appeal filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: COURT OF APPEAL Date of Letter: 5/14/18 Re: Failure to cure this default in the Kern County Superior Court within 15 days of the date of this letter may result in the dismissal of your appeal pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.140(a)(1).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: for Dismissal of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketNotice - Default on Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2015
  • Docket4011 Petition - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition for Immmediate suspension of trustee's powers MO 060415: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -- PETITION FOR IMMEDIATE SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE S POWERS, REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE, ACCOUNTING, INSTRUCTIONS, CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST, TRO, PRELIM AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 6/4/2015 @ 9:00AM IN DIV. P - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR HEAR1ISTG ON PETITION FOR IMMEDIATE SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEFS POWERS, REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE, ACCOUNTiNG, INSTRUCTIONS, CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIONS; DECLARATION OF WARNER KIND. PETITION FOR IMMEDIATE SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEFS POWERS, REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE, ACCOUNTING, INSTRUCTIONS, CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIONS; DECLARATION OF WARNER KIND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • Docket824G Pmt: Probate - Req Hearing GC 70657(A); 70617(A) 8/6/12 - Comment: Amount of $60.00 for SUPERTINO, LYNETTE YVONNE (PE-1). Received from BOWMAN & ASSOCIATES, check no(s) 8790. Receipt #832104 for amount of $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • Docket879D PMT: Probate Petitions, Objections or Other - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for SUPERTINO, LYNETTE YVONNE (PE-1). Received from BOWMAN & ASSOCIATES, check no(s) 8789. Receipt #832086 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketNew Case Filed - Comment: Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketPetition - Comment: PETITION FOR IMMEDIATE SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE'S POWERS, REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE, ACCOUNTING, INSTRUCTIONS, CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, AND PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUCTIONS 6/4/15 9:00AM P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition - Comment: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR HEARING ON PETITION FOR IMMEDIATE SUSPENSION OF TRUSTEE'S POWERS, REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE, ACCOUNTING, INSTRUCTIONS, CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, AND PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.