This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 16:38:54 (UTC).

ANDRADE VS SOUTH VALLEY TRANSPORT, INC

Case Summary

On 09/05/2017 ANDRADE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SOUTH VALLEY TRANSPORT, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2063

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDRADE, SHARON

ANDRADE, ARMANDO

Defendants and Cross Defendants

DALKE, STEVEN JAMES

SOUTH VALLEY TRANSPORT, INC.

TRIPLE E TRUCKING LLC

Cross Plaintiff

TRIPLE E. TRUCKING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARNETT, TYLER J

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

OLSON, DEAN A

FIELDS, GARY D

MCNAMARA, KEVIN P

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MCNAMARA, KEVIN P

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 04/04/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for Dismissal: Cannot dismiss entire action due to cross-complaint & complaint in intervention still being active.

Ruling

Ruling 03/18/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 03/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/12/19 Plaintiffs ARMANDO ANDRADE and SHARON ANDRADE Ex parte application to vacate stay of proceedings

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of Stay: #2 is incorrect.

Ruling

Ruling 01/28/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion for Leave

Motion for Leave 01/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/26/2018, Plaintiff-in-Intervention: Pave Tech, Inc., and Federal Insurance Co., C/O Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., Motion for Leave of Court to File the Complaint-in-Intervention, ResID: 33602

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of Service is missing proper face page.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Per conversation with Attorney Mary Montelongo's Assistant this filing can not be accepted via e-file. Any questions contact Court Clerk.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Duplicate filing, A proposed order was accepted by the Court on 11/26/2018.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Amendment to Complaint requires a designated area for judicial officer's approval.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: 2nd Rejection. Date of Case Management Conference is incorrect. Please read 3rd paragraph of Notice carefully and resubmit.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Date of Case Management Conference is incorrect. Please correct and resubmit.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:12/20/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: 3.1385 as to Cross-Complaint only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: 3.1385 as to the Complaint only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: jury for all parties t/e 10-15 days **-Notice of Stay filed 3/7/19 by South Valley Transport, Inc.---- No Action to be Taken per Honorale David R. Lampe***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: j.t set 05/06/19 9am dept 11 t/e 10-15 days jury for all parties **-Notice of Stay filed 3/7/19 by South Valley Transport, Inc.---- No Action to be Taken per Honorale David R. Lampe***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketWithdrawal From Trust Fund - Comment: Processed trust refund for $435 to Tyler J Barnett (Yuhl/Stoner/Carr LLP). Completed on 04/12/19. CR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketMotion to Determine Good Faith Settlement - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 3/14/2019 Defendant: TRIPLE E. TRUCKING LLC Notice of Motion for Good Faith Settlement Determination ResID: 34440

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With Prejudice as to Cross-Complaint Triple E Trucking, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO SOUTH VALLEY TRANSPORT, INC. AND STEVEN JAMES DALKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: As to Pave-Tech, Inc. By mail.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint on South Valley Transport

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:12/20/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 09/10/2017; Served: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.