This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 09:42:03 (UTC).

ANDERSON VS M AND O REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/05/2013 ANDERSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against M AND O REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8061

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSON, DAN

Defendants

M AND O REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC

KERN APARTMENTS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: JOEL COHEN FOR M AND O REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: REBECCA COHEN FOR M AND O REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF. REBECCA COHEN APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR M AND O REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC. *************************************************************************************** CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF. CASE RECALLED AT 9:45 A.M. DAN ANDERSON (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. REPRESENTATIVE, JOEL COHEN ALSO PRESENT. THE COURT RECALLS THE PREVIOUS DISMISSAL MADE. CASE PROCEEDS TO TRIAL. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY DEFENSE. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR DEFENANT AGAINST PLAINTIFF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • Docket4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO M AND O REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO M AND O REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: PLAINTIFF REQUESTED CONTINUANCE FOR MORE TIME TO SERVE. NO PROOF OF RECEIPT OR RETURNED UNCLAIMED OF CERTIFIED MAIL SENT BY THE COURT RETURNED TO THE COURT. ~ calid=2426939 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:02/20/2014, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:SCT, Judge:LSE, SystemDate:12/10/2013 10:59:27 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF PLAINTIFF FOR CONTINUANCE TO HAVE DEFENDANT SERVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO DAN ANDERSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: SENT THIS DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED PRO PER* A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO DAN ANDERSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less