This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 15:21:57 (UTC).

ANDERSON VS ANDERSON (B)

Case Summary

On 01/13/2016 ANDERSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ANDERSON B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benavides, Jose R., Fielder, John L., Schuett, Stephen D. and Cannon, Gloria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1122

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Benavides, Jose R.

Fielder, John L.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Cannon, Gloria

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANDERSON, RUTH

Respondent

ANDERSON, ROD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

BITTLESTON, DAWN O

STOKER, IRA L

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

4/18/16 MO REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET S/S ATTY F/C PROP RSTRT PROP CNTRL STMNT OF DEC 03/14/16; Parties Present Petitioner: ANDERSON, RUTH; Respondent: ANDERSON, ROD

Request for Order - Petitioner

03/14/16 MO PETITIONER SPOUSAL SUPPORT, ATTORNEY FEES/COST, PROPERTY RESTRAINT, STATEMENT OF DECISIO: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET S/S ATTY F/C PROP RSTRT PROP CNTRL STMNT OF DEC

Ruling

03/11/16 RULING REASSIGNMENT: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Request for Order - Petitioner

02/24/16 MO: REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET S/S ATTY F/C STMNT OF DEC PROP RESTRAINT 16COURT--13COURT

Ex Parte Hearing

**MO - Public PET EX PARTE PROPERTY CONTROL/RESTRAINTS: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET EX-PARTE PROP RESTRAINT PROP CONTROL HEALTH INSURANCE; Parties Present Petitioner: ANDERSON, RUTH; Respondent: ANDERSON, ROD

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: PRO PER New Attorney:IRA L STOKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: RE AT-ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketWage & Earnings Assignment Order - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: $1619 CURRENT SPOUSAL SUPPORT $381 PAST DUE SPOUSAL SUPPORT $2000 TOTAL DEDUCTIONS/MONTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: SHANNON DODGE New Attorney: IN PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketWage & Earnings Assignment Order - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: $1619 CURRENT SPOUSAL SUPPORT $381 ARREAGES SPOUSAL SUPPORT $2000 TOTAL DEDUCTIONS/ MONTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: HEARING 4/18/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: DAWN BITTLESTON New Attorney: SHANNON DODGE

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2016
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge-170.6 - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: JUDGE JOSE R BENAVIDES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - 02/24/16 MO: REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET S/S ATTY F/C STMNT OF DEC PROP RESTRAINT 16COURT--13COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketTemporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - **MO - Public PET EX PARTE PROPERTY CONTROL/RESTRAINTS: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET EX-PARTE PROP RESTRAINT PROP CONTROL HEALTH INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: Hearing Date: 02/03/16 Hearing Time: 11:00AM Hearing Department/Division:MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PET S/S ATTY F/C STMNT OF DEC PROP RESTRAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BITTLESTON, DAWN O

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STOKER, IRA L