This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:46:15 (UTC).

AMERICAN HOMES 4 RENT MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC VS GRUETER

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 AMERICAN HOMES 4 RENT MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GRUETER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0080

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN HOMES 4 RENT MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC

Defendant

GRUETER, DYLAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LONG, HELEN GRAYCE

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) 07/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed; Comment: continued from 6/16/17

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

06/16/17-MO: Order to Show Cause-Local Rule 3.15.1(C): Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Palmer, William D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Before Court Trial; Unlawful Detainer:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketDismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) 07/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed; Comment: continued from 6/16/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: AS TO DYLAN GRUETER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - 06/16/17-MO: Order to Show Cause-Local Rule 3.15.1(C): Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO DYLAN GRUETER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LONG, HELEN GRAYCE, AMERICAN HOMES 4 RENT MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC; Served: 04/05/20174:13 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 1117 HAZELNUT ST WASCO, CA 93280 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less