This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 08:15:26 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS V. HERREJON

Case Summary

On 05/08/2012 AMERICAN EXPRESS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERREJON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3201

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

Defendant

HERREJON, ARMANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL, LINA M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: OSC ON 4/12/13 VACATED ~ calid=1915912 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:04/12/2013, Courtroom:AD, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:RST, Deputy:soniah, SystemDate:5/8/2012 3:11:12 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Vacated - Default Judgment Entered - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: OSC ON 10/12/12 VACATED ~ calid=1915909 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:10/12/2012, Courtroom:AD, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:RST, Deputy:soniah, SystemDate:5/8/2012 3:10:50 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED:SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; STATEMENT OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION; ADR INFORMATION PACKAGE WHO SERVED:ARMANDO HERREJON AKA HERREJON ARMANDO GARCIA HOW SERVED:SUBSTITUTED SERVICE DATE SERVED:6/7/12 FEE:$65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 12, 2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 12, 2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 12, 2012 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 12, 2012 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • Docket843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS B... (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 38490. Receipt #653860 for amount of $225.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 556

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M