This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:19:02 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK VS JOST

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOST. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6184

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

JOST, SHARYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIEF, ESQ., AMY

Attorney at THE MOORE LAW GROUP, APC

3710 S. Susan St. Suite 210, Po Box 25145

Santa Ana, CA 92704

LIEF, AMY E

Attorney at MOORE LAW GROUP APC

Po Box 25145 / 3710 S Susan St #210

Santa Ana, CA 92704

BAUM, AMY E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: JUDMENT SIGNED ~ calid=2206260 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:03/25/2014, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, SystemDate:3/29/2013 11:28:47 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: AS TO SHARYN JOST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • Declaration and Order - Comment: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER ETIENNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • Declaration Re Computation of Interest and Lack - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • Request for Clerk's Judgment - Comment: AS TO SHARYN JOST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • Request to Enter Default - Comment: DEFAULT ONLY AS TO SHARYN JOST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: 10/8/13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING VACATED, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ~ calid=2206257 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:10/08/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:RYANB, SystemDate:3/29/2013 11:28:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO SHARYN JOST SERVED 4/6/13 BY SUBSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • 843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (PL-1). Received from THE MOORE LAW GROUP, APC, check no(s) 23386. Receipt #709883 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 25, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 25, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 08, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 08, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY AMY LIEF, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY AMY LIEF, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less