This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 08:44:57 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK VS MCPHERSON, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/03/2015 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MCPHERSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R. and Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0074

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

Defendants

H & M MACHINE SHOP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ADBA H/M MACHINE SHOP, INC

MCPHERSON, WILLIAM E

MCPHERSON, BILL

MCPHERSON, BILL E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL, LINA M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern/Original Returned Via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: RE:Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: RE:Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Ventura County/ Original returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Total:$21,282.54 as to: Bill McPherson, aka William E. McPherson, aka Bill E. McPherson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Lisa D. Dubowski Re: Copies of Documents in Lieu of Originals;Declaration of Lisa D. Dubowski Re:Account for Entry of Default Judgment and Brief Summary of Case Pursuan to CRC 3.1800

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Comment: for Judgment and Court's acceptance of Copies in Lieu of Originals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Bill McPherson aka William E. Mcpherson, aka Bill E. McPherson; H&M Machine Shop, Inc.,a California Corporation, dba H/M Machine Shop Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to does 1 to 20 in regards to all counts;count 2;Quantum Meruit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Bill McPerson, aka William E. McPherson, aka Bill E. McPherson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service upon William Edward Mcpherson for H & M Machine Shop, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Bill McPherson aka William E. McPherson, aka Bill E. McPherson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 09/09/2015; Served: 09/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less