This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:48:38 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK VS MIGUEL CORONADO AKA MIGUEL C. CORONADO AKA MIGUEL C. TAPIA

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MIGUEL CORONADO AKA MIGUEL C CORONADO AKA MIGUEL C TAPIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1821

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

Defendant

MIGUEL CORONADO AKA MIGUEL C. CORONADO AKA MIGUEL C. TAPIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL, LINA M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: acknowledgment of satisfaction of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Abstract

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK; Awarded Against: MIGUEL CORONADO AKA MIGUEL C. CORONADO AKA MIGUEL C. TAPIA; Amount; Damages: $4,960.06; Costs: $290.00; Total: $5250.06; Party: Names: AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK; MIGUEL CORONADO AKA MIGUEL C. CORONADO AKA MIGUEL C. TAPIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: as to MIGUEL CORONADO aka MIGUEL C TAPIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Request for Dismissal of does

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Default Judgment Packet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: 1033 Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketAmended Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO MIGUEL CORONADO , PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO MIGUEL CORONADO , PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less