This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 03:25:55 (UTC).

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY CO. VS BARCELONA II LLC

Case Summary

On 12/17/2012 AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY CO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BARCELONA II LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8327

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

BARCELONA II, LLC, A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MORELAND, TERRY L

TERRY L MORELAND, AS TRUSTEE OF THE MORELAND FAMILY TRUST

MORELAND, PEGGY J

PEGGY J MORELAND, AS TRUSTEE OF THE MORELAND FAMILY TRUST

CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, LLC, A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MORELAND FAMILY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LAS VEGAS VA1, LLC, A REVOKED NEVADA CORPORATION

STOCKDALE TOWER, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MORELAND AIRCRAFT, LLC

TERRY L MORELAND, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

OREGON VA1, LLC, AN OREGON CORPORATION

SELECT AVENUE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MARANATHA CORRECTIONS, LLC, A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LOS PORTALES, LLC, A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BARCELONA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TERRY L. MORELAND, AS TRUSTEE OF THE MORELAND FAMILY TRUST

TERRY L. MORELAND, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MORELAND AIRCRAFT, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHILDBACH

SCHILDBACH, JENNIFER M

400 N Tustin Ave #120

Santa Ana, CA 927053815

CULLEN, CHRISTOPHER M

 

Court Documents

Debtor's Examination

as to terry: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO PEGGY J MORELAND

Debtor's Examination

as to peggy: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO TERRY L MORELAND; Parties Present Defendant: MORELAND, PEGGY J

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: As per Writ issued 12/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - as to terry: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO PEGGY J MORELAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - as to peggy: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO TERRY L MORELAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: on Application & Order for appearence & examination as to Peggy J. Moreland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: AS TO TERRY L MORELAND Hearing Date: 7/30/15 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: AS TO PEGGY J MORELAND Hearing Date: 7/30/15 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE 4

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2013
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. BREACH OF CONTRACT 3. STATUTORY INDEMNITY 4. SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE 5. DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CALIF... (PL-1). Received from ACS, check no(s) 24836. Receipt #692691 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketNotice / Assign / Status / JES - Comment: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE LORNA H BRUMFIELD FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 15 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "LHB" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE LORNA H BRUMFIELD ON Jun 17, 2013 AT 8:15 AM IN DEPARTMENT 17 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet, Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE LORNA H BRUMFIELD FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 15 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "LHB" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE LORNA H BRUMFIELD ON Jun 17, 2013 AT 8:15 AM IN DEPARTMENT 17 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet, Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 02, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 02, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: RT VIA ACS/ SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY JENNIFER M SCHILDBACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: OCC 37

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.