This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/19/2020 at 11:08:25 (UTC).

AMBRIZ VS R + L CARRIERS

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 AMBRIZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against R L CARRIERS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3157

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMBRIZ, NAU

Defendants

R + L CARRIERS

BREILING, TIMOTHY GORDON

R+L CARRIERS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOLEDO, DEL L

Defendant Attorney

PERRIS, ASHAN K

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 2/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Continued from 05/05/2020 by Standing Order;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to all Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 2/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R+L CARRIERS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEIRIS ASHAN