This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 20:27:19 (UTC).

ALVIN LEE NUTT DECEASED

Case Summary

On 02/26/2015 ALVIN LEE NUTT DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph Wm., Kendall, Andrew and Myers, Brett. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********4745

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph Wm.

Kendall, Andrew

Myers, Brett

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BAILEY, WILLIAM LESHERMAN

JOHNSON, RACHELLE

Advance Inheritance, LLC.

Decedent

NUTT, ALVIN LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

HALIMI, GEORGE MAYER

LEESTMA, JAMES LAMBERT

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Endorsed fee waiver order...returned via file & serve

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Report of sale...returned via file & serve

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Assignment and Request for Special Notice by Advance Inheritance, LLC.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER MAIL

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER ATTORNEY BIN

Motion

5/12/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND FOR MONETARY SANCTION 5/12/16 CALENDAR #3

Petition for Probate of Will

PETITION FOR PROBAT OF WILL: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - BAILEY'S PETITION NOTES- 1. Need notice of petition to all persons listed on will. 3. Copy of will is not attached to proof of subscribing forms filed 07/23/15. 09/03/15 CALENDAR #2; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HALIMI, GEORGE MAYER; Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Petition for Letters

PETITION FOR LETTERS: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -JOHNSON'S PETITION 09/03/15 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HALIMI, GEORGE MAYER; Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Petition for Probate of Will

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL: Judicial Officer(s): Knight, Alisa R., Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES- 1. Attachment #14 is incomplete. Need decedent's spouse name & date of death. 2. Need Notice of Petition to Administer Estate for Mary Edwards. 3. Will is not self-proving. Need Proof of Subscribing Witness.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HALIMI, GEORGE MAYER; Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 06/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Petitioner obtained a $435 filing fee waivers for filing of initial petition, $60 for filing motion for order compelling, $435 for filing report/petition re sale, $26 for certification and copy, $435 for filing of this petition. Total fees due is $1,391 and not set forth as liability of estate in paragraph 43. 2. Exhibit 1 re Summary of Account indicates the I&A value is $193,000, which is incorrect. $193,000 is re I&A Reappraisal for Sale only. Final I&A was filed 04/20/17 for $178,000. The Summary of Account shall be in a format substantially following Prob. Code 1060, 1061. 3. Schedule A re disbursement to attorney/George M Halimi and Exhibit 6 re Disbursement to Robin Maxey were already requested as cost advanced reimbursement (see paragraph 24) to be reimbursed to respective person and does not appear to be a disbursement. 4. Need amended Summary of Account schedule (see #s 2, 3, 4 above). 5. Preliminary distribution of $5,000 paid to William Bailey. Need receipt from same. 6. Supplement filed 04/12/18 set for proposed distribution in #13 of prayer only and not set forth within petition. 7. $3,150.73 reserved set forth in prayer #10 and Supplement filed on 04/12/18 prayer #10 only and not in petition. Also the amount does not match proposed distribution in #13 of same supplement filed 04/12/18 ($3,150.73 vs. $3,382.73).

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Assignment of beneficial interest

Petition for Sale

Petition for Sale 02/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - REPORT OF SALE - 909 E 18TH STREET, BAKERSFIELD, CA; Parties Present Petitioner: JOHNSON, RACHELLE; Attorney: HALIMI, GEORGE MAYER

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Waiver

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Report of sale...returned via SASE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Report of sale...returned via SASE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Assignment and request for special notice by Advance Inheritance, LLC.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 09/01/2016: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR LETTERS (JOHNSON PETITION) SAME NOTE: 1. Mary Edwards is a named executor in the will, need proof she was noticed of this action. 9/1/16 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner: JOHNSON, RACHELLE; Attorney: HALIMI, GEORGE MAYER; Petitioner: BAILEY, WILLIAM LESHERMAN; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Case Management Conference

MO 121015: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: #1 on 12-10-15 calendar READY FOR HEARING WITH COMMENT / CMC - JOHNSON'S PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER THE INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATES ACT WITH LIMITED AUTHORITY AND SUPPLEMENT THERETO 1. If Terrance Lee Junious is a child of decedent, he is entitled to notice.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HALIMI, GEORGE MAYER; Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order Approving Final Account and for Distribution; and Distribution from Blocked Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 09/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Third supplement to first and final account and report of administrator; petition for allowance of statutory and extraordinary attorney's fees; and petition for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: THIRD SUPPLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 06/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Petitioner obtained a $435 filing fee waivers for filing of initial petition, $60 for filing motion for order compelling, $435 for filing report/petition re sale, $26 for certification and copy, $435 for filing of this petition. Total fees due is $1,391 and not set forth as liability of estate in paragraph 43. 2. Exhibit 1 re Summary of Account indicates the I&A value is $193,000, which is incorrect. $193,000 is re I&A Reappraisal for Sale only. Final I&A was filed 04/20/17 for $178,000. The Summary of Account shall be in a format substantially following Prob. Code 1060, 1061. 3. Schedule A re disbursement to attorney/George M Halimi and Exhibit 6 re Disbursement to Robin Maxey were already requested as cost advanced reimbursement (see paragraph 24) to be reimbursed to respective person and does not appear to be a disbursement. 4. Need amended Summary of Account schedule (see #s 2, 3, 4 above). 5. Preliminary distribution of $5,000 paid to William Bailey. Need receipt from same. 6. Supplement filed 04/12/18 set for proposed distribution in #13 of prayer only and not set forth within petition. 7. $3,150.73 reserved set forth in prayer #10 and Supplement filed on 04/12/18 prayer #10 only and not in petition. Also the amount does not match proposed distribution in #13 of same supplement filed 04/12/18 ($3,150.73 vs. $3,382.73).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketRequest - Comment: Request for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: re: proof of deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: First supplement to first and final account and report of administrator; petition for allowance of statutory and extraordinary attorney's fees; and petition for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2015
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: FIRST SUPPLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER THE INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATES ACT WITH LIMITED AUTHORITY 4/30/15 9:00AM P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PETITION FOR LETTERS...RETURNED VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: RACHELLE JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • DocketNew Case Filed - Comment: Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: RACHELLE JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.