This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/06/2023 at 13:37:10 (UTC).

ALVAREZ, JR. VS TORRES ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 ALVAREZ, JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TORRES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0153

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVAREZ, RAMON

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF DELANO, A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF KERN, A PUBLIC ENTITY

DELANO JOINT UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY

TORRES, ARMANDO MENDOZA

VALDEZ, JOSE MENDOZA

TORRES, MARICELA MENDOZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/17/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

01/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Order to Show Cause

01/18/2023: Order to Show Cause

Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil)

01/21/2023: Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil)

Electronic Rejection Notice

01/21/2023: Electronic Rejection Notice

Summons Issued and Filed

02/01/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

First Amended Complaint

01/31/2023: First Amended Complaint

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

05/03/2023: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom 2 located at 3131 Arrow Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom 2 located at 3131 Arrow Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom 2 located at 3131 Arrow Street; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom 2 located at 3131 Arrow Street; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: Summons on First Amended Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ALVAREZ, RAMON, Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: First Amended Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ALVAREZ, RAMON, Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: GAL REJECTED MINOR OVER 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil); Comment: **DENIED**; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ALVAREZ, RAMON, Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 5/3/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ALVAREZ, RAMON, Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ALVAREZ, RAMON, Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less