This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/25/2023 at 09:35:26 (UTC).

ALVAREZ, JR. VS TORRES ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 ALVAREZ, JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TORRES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zulfa, David and Smith, T. Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0153

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zulfa, David

Smith, T. Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVAREZ, RAMON, Jr.

Defendants

TORRES, ARMANDO MENDOZA

VALDEZ, JOSE MENDOZA

TORRES, MARICELA MENDOZA

DELANO JOINT UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHAZARYAN, LUSINE

Defendant Attorney

STREET, NICHOLAS J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

05/03/2023: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

First Amended Complaint

01/31/2023: First Amended Complaint

Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil)

01/21/2023: Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil)

Order to Show Cause

01/18/2023: Order to Show Cause

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

01/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Complaint

01/17/2023: Complaint

Rejection/Correction Notice

07/28/2023: Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice

07/25/2023: Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice

07/25/2023: Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice

07/25/2023: Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice

07/24/2023: Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice

07/17/2023: Rejection/Correction Notice

Case Management Conference 07/17/2023

07/17/2023: Case Management Conference 07/17/2023

Rejection/Correction Notice

07/06/2023: Rejection/Correction Notice

Ruling 07/05/2023

07/05/2023: Ruling 07/05/2023

Ruling 07/05/2023

07/05/2023: Ruling 07/05/2023

Rejection/Correction Notice

06/30/2023: Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice

06/23/2023: Rejection/Correction Notice

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2023
  • HearingCase Number: BCV-23-100153; Style/Defendant: ALVAREZ, JR. VS TORRES ET AL; Case Type: 22-CV Auto - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Judge: Zulfa, David; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division J; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2023
  • HearingCase Number: BCV-23-100153; Style/Defendant: ALVAREZ, JR. VS TORRES ET AL; Case Type: 22-CV Auto - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judge: Zulfa, David; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division J; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2023
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: cont'd from 07/17/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: cont from 5/3/23, 6/2/23, 07/17/23 As to defendant Maricela Mendoza Torres only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • DocketCourt Use Only - Pre-Cleared Substantive/Demurrer; Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Pre-Cleared Reservation Expired; Comment: 07/05/23 reservation expires 07/10/23 Defendant County of Kern Demurrer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered; Comment: REJECTION OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS. Re-sent to address provided on return label: 910 S Broadway Los Angeles Ca 90015-1610

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: without prejudice as to complaint as to Defendant California Department of Education, a public entity

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice; Comment: RE: Request for Dismissal, please correct item 1(b)(6) party name listed must conform to the party name listed in this case and the First Amended Complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: without prejudice, complaint as to City of Delano ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: without prejudice, complaint as to County of Kern ONKY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2023
  • HearingCase Number: BCV-23-100153; Style/Defendant: ALVAREZ, JR. VS TORRES ET AL; Case Type: 22-CV Auto - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judge: Smith, T. Mark; Courtroom: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom T-2 located at 3131 Arrow St.; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Original Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: Summons on First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice; Comment: GAL REJECTED MINOR OVER 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2023
  • DocketApplication / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil); Comment: **DENIED**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents; Unserved; Served: 06/01/20231:29 PM; Unserved; Served: 06/01/2023; Served: 06/02/20239:40 AM; Served: 06/03/2023; Served: 06/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 5/3/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less