This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:48:55 (UTC).

ALVAREZ ET AL VS CONSTRUCTION SPECIALTY SERVICE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 ALVAREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CONSTRUCTION SPECIALTY SERVICE, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0452

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVEN ALVAREZ, AS AN AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEE ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND OTHER CURRENT AND FORMER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES

Defendants

CONSTRUCTION SPECIALTY SERVICE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GEORGE, DANIEL I

CONSTRUCTION SPECIALTY SERVICE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAN, DOUGLAS

Defendant Attorneys

BELDEN, T SCOTT

EGLAND, TERRENCE T

 

Court Documents

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 10/18/2016: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (cont'd from 07/26/2016)

Case Management Conference

07/26/2016 Minute Order: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: EGLAND, TERRENCE T

Case Management Conference

04/19/16 - M.O. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing ruling: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Demurrer

03/14/16 MO: Demurrer: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 2/11/16 by Plaintiff Steven Alvarez. Demurrer to Defendant Construction Specialty Service, Inc's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. ResID: 14293.

Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Demurrer

DEMURRER: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/30/15 Defendant, Construction Specialty Service, Inc. Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint ResID: 11688

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Demurrer

DEMURRER: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/31/15 Defendant, CONSTRUCTION SPECIALTY SERVICE, INC Demurrer to the Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Cont'd from 07/26/16, 10/18/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice on complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - **MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional - Comment: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 10/18/2016: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (cont'd from 07/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement regarding October 18, 2016 Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - 07/26/2016 Minute Order: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketNotice of Hearing/Demurrer - Comment: Demurrer to the Complaint Hearing Date: 10/9/15 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Construction Specialty Service, Inc., a California Corporation; substituted service on 8/10/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: on First Amended Complaint. Returned via ACS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/29/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ALVAREZ, STEVEN, STEVEN ALVAREZ ON BEHALF OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND ON BEHALF OF AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT ("PAGA"); Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less