This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 21:14:59 (UTC).

ALTAONE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS PONCE

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 ALTAONE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against PONCE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2491

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALTAONE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Respondent

PONCE, EDGAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RUSHFORD, FRANCIS G.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to EDGAR PONCE ORDER AFTER HEARING, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: AMS Legal Support Re: Refund of Filing Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketWorkplace Violence Restraining Order After Hearing (WV-130) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketTo ensure the public has access to court proceedings - Comment: during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions. By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketPetition for Harassment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: POS / TRO GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO EDGAR PONCE , PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (CH-110) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (WV-110) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: 100 yards stay away orders granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (WV-109) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: 11/17/20 @830am dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ALTAONE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPetition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders (WV-100)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: CIVIC CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALTAONE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUSHFORD FRANCIS