This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:47:15 (UTC).

ALTAONE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS C & A MOTORS, a California corporation

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 ALTAONE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against C A MOTORS, a California corporation. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0711

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALTAONE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

C & A MOTORS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff

C&A MOTORS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Defendant

BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DOMINGUEZ, CHRISTOPHER E

HARVEY, JAMES R

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

STREET, NICHOLAS J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONTINUED BY COURT; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: STREET, NICHOLAS J

Order to Show Cause: Writ of Attachment

Order to Show Cause: Writ of Attachment 09/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO C&A MOTORS. CONTINUED TO 09/18/2017; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: STREET, NICHOLAS J

Order to Show Cause: Writ of Attachment

Order to Show Cause: Writ of Attachment 09/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FILED 8/11/17 MOVING PARTY; PLAINTIFF AS TO C & A MOTORS; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: STREET, NICHOLAS J; Plaintiff; Attorney: HARVEY, JAMES R

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE: PAYMENTS BEING MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: County of Kern ***Returned via AMS***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: ALTAONE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION; Awarded Against: C & A MOTORS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Amount; Damages: $379,516.60; Total: $379516.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: AS TO C&A MOTORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of James R. Harvey In Support of Stipulated Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional - Comment: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE; CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY C&A MOTORS, INC ON 06/30/17, AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession After Hearing - Comment: APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER; ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketNotice / Application for Writ of Possession - Comment: NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER; ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE AS TO C & A MOTORS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment: & FILED AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: Hearing Date: Hearing Time: Hearing Department/Division:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less