This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:45:55 (UTC).

ALTAMIRANO VS MATA (B)

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 ALTAMIRANO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MATA B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K. and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4603

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALTAMIRANO, DAISY HINOJOSA

Respondent

MATA, CHRISTIAN JOSE

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 11/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Respondent: MATA, CHRISTIAN JOSE

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 10/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/11/17 RES WAIVE PET DISCLOSURES; Parties Present Respondent: MATA, CHRISTIAN JOSE

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 12/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: ALTAMIRANO, DAISY HINOJOSA; Respondent: MATA, CHRISTIAN JOSE

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 09/12/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/13/17 RES DV/TRO REIMBURSEMENT CONT'D FROM 8/29/17; Parties Present Petitioner: ALTAMIRANO, DAISY HINOJOSA; Respondent: MATA, CHRISTIAN JOSE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 08/29/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/13/17 RES DV/TRO REIMBURSEMENT RES 1ST CONTINUANCE FROM 08/08/2017; Parties Present Petitioner: ALTAMIRANO, DAISY HINOJOSA; Respondent: MATA, CHRISTIAN JOSE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Judgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: SIGNED PURSUANT TO C.C.P 635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Mediated Agreement - Settlement of Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 12/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: ALTAMIRANO, DAISY HINOJOSA; Respondent: MATA, CHRISTIAN JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 11/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Respondent: MATA, CHRISTIAN JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 10/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/11/17 RES WAIVE PET DISCLOSURES; Parties Present Respondent: MATA, CHRISTIAN JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Settlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • At-Issue Memorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2017
  • Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Temporary Restraining Order - CLETS (Existing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Request for DV Restraining Order Existing No Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Court Interpreter Services - FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less