This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 20:05:41 (UTC).

ALSABAHI VS ALGAADI (E)

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 ALSABAHI filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against ALGAADI E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L., Gill, Susan M., Bittleston, Dawn, Foley, Therese M., Diesman, Kathleen O. and Cannon, Gloria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4161

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Gill, Susan M.

Bittleston, Dawn

Foley, Therese M.

Diesman, Kathleen O.

Cannon, Gloria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALSABAHI

Petitioner

ALSABAHI, MOHAMED

Defendant

ALGAADI(E)

Respondent

ALGAADI, NEHAD

Minors

COUNSEL, MINOR

COUNSEL, MINOR'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GARCIA, XOCHITL M

Respondent Attorneys

GORSKI, VINCENT A

GORSKI, VINCENT A.

ZUNIGA, JESUS L

Minor Attorney

CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 08/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/16/18 RES C/S S/S DIVISION OF TAX REFUND 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 06/15/2018 7/10/18 8/3/18; Parties Present Petitioner: ALSABAHI, MOHAMED; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M; Respondent: ALGAADI, NEHAD; Privately Retained: GORSKI, VINCENT A.

Family Centered Case Resolution

Request for Order - Respondent 08/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/10/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR; Parties Present Respondent; Privately Retained: GORSKI, VINCENT A.

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 7/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/16/18 RES C/S S/S DIVISION OF TAX REFUND 3 MINORS RES 1ST CONTINUANCE FROM 06/15/2018; Parties Present Petitioner: ALSABAHI, MOHAMED; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M; Respondent: ALGAADI, NEHAD; Privately Retained: GORSKI, VINCENT A.

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 05/14/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/04/17 RES DV/TRO C/C C/V PROP RSTRNT 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 2/26/18 *FILED BY NEHAD ALGAADI IN CASE NO BFL-17-4116*; Parties Present Petitioner: ALSABAHI, MOHAMED; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M; Respondent: ALGAADI, NEHAD; Privately Retained: GORSKI, VINCENT A.

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 02/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/11/17 PET C/C C/V PROP CNTRL STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 1/29/18; Parties Present Petitioner: ALSABAHI, MOHAMED; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M; Respondent: ALGAADI, NEHAD; Privately Retained: GORSKI, VINCENT A

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 01/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/11/17 PET C/C C/V PROP CNTRL STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 11/20/17; Parties Present Petitioner: ALSABAHI, MOHAMED; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M; Respondent: ALGAADI, NEHAD; Privately Retained: GORSKI, VINCENT A

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: HRG 01/29/18 DIV E

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 11/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/11/17 PET C/C C/V PROP CNTRL STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: ALSABAHI, MOHAMED; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M; Respondent: ALGAADI, NEHAD

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 10/11/2017: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PE EX PARTE C/C C/V PROP CONTROL; Parties Present Petitioner: ALSABAHI, MOHAMED; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M; Respondent: ALGAADI, NEHAD

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 02/27/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: SET FROM 1/14/20 DIV E **ARABIC INTERPRETER REQUESTED ON 1/14/20**

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/29/2019: Judicial Officer: Diesman, Kathleen O.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: 09/25/19 PET BIFURCATE

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 08/08/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONTD FROM 8/03/19 8/09/18 8/15/19 10/09/18 11/06/18 1/29/19 3/20/19 6/12/19 **STATUS**; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M; Respondent: ALGAADI, NEHAD; Attorney: ZUNIGA, JESUS L; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 03/20/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONTD FROM 8/3/18 8/9/18 8/15/18 10/9/18 11/6/18 1/29; Parties Present Petitioner: ALSABAHI, MOHAMED; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M; Respondent: ALGAADI, NEHAD; Privately Retained: GORSKI, VINCENT A.; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 01/29/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/16/18 RES C/S S/S DIVISION OF TAX REFUND 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 06/15/2018 7/10/18 8/3/18 8/9/18 8/15/18 10/9/18 11/6/18; Parties Present Petitioner: ALSABAHI, MOHAMED; Respondent: ALGAADI, NEHAD; Minor Party: COUNSEL, MINOR'S; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Family Centered Case Resolution

Request for Order - Respondent 11/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/10/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONTD FROM 8/3/18 8/9/18 8/15/18 10/9/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M; Respondent; Privately Retained: GORSKI, VINCENT A.

Family Centered Case Resolution

Request for Order - Respondent 10/09/2018: Judicial Officer(s): Bittleston, Dawn, Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/10/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONTD FROM 8/3/18 8/9/18 8/15/18; Parties Present Petitioner: ALSABAHI, MOHAMED; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M; Respondent: ALGAADI, NEHAD; Privately Retained: GORSKI, VINCENT A.

Family Centered Case Resolution

Request for Order - Respondent 08/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/10/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONTD FROM 8/3/18 8/9/18; Parties Present Petitioner: ALSABAHI, MOHAMED; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M; Respondent: ALGAADI, NEHAD; Privately Retained: GORSKI, VINCENT A.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: SET FROM 1/14/20 **ARABIC INTERPRETER REQUESTED ON 1/14/20**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: SET FROM 1/14/20 CONT'D FROM 5/13/20, 10/15/20 MC FEES COUNSEL TO REQUEST ARABIC INTERPRETER IF NEEDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: SET FROM 1/14/20 CONT'D FROM 5/13/20 MC FEES COUNSEL TO REQUEST ARABIC INTERPRETER IF NEEDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketNotice Re Payment of Support - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: RE: C/C C/V C/S S/S **ARABIC INTERPRETER REQUESTED ON 1/14/20**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: SET FROM 1/14/20 CONT'D FROM 5/13/20 MC FEES COUNSEL TO REQUEST ARABIC INTERPRETER IF NEEDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: SET FROM 1/14/20 **ARABIC INTERPRETER REQUESTED ON 1/14/20**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: SET FROM 1/14/20 DIV E **ARABIC INTERPRETER REQUESTED ON 1/14/20**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT FROM 10/22/19 **ARABIC INTERPRETER REQUEST ON 10/22/19 FOR 01/14/19**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: HRG 01/29/18 DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/11/17 PET C/C C/V PROP CNTRL STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY FATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketTemporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: EX PARTE DENIED / PROPERTY CONTROL GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG 11/20/17 DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PE EX PARTE C/C C/V PROP CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: Hearing Date: 10/11/17 Hearing Time: 11:00AM Hearing Department/Division:MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Legal Separation

    Read MoreRead Less