This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 14:52:44 (UTC).

ALMENDAREZ VS CENTEX HOMES

Case Summary

On 02/13/2014 ALMENDAREZ filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CENTEX HOMES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1306

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALMENDAREZ, PETRA

ALMENDAREZ, JESSE

BATRES, ROBERTO

DOMINGUEZ, MARY JANE

DOMINGUEZ, JASON

MARTINEZ, STEVEN

CACAL, SEAN

FRANCISCO, ALOHA

GUTIERREZ, MARIA

RIOS, SANTIAGO

GARIBAY, ROSA

GARIBAY, JAVIER

GUTIERREZ, CAMERINO

ORDONEZ, ESMERALDA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CENTEX HOMES, A NEVADA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

Cross Defendants

BROKEN DRUM OF BAKERSFIELD, INC.

R S I PROFESSIONAL CABINET SOLUTIONS

CASKEY CORPORATION DBA CENTURY GLASS

NORTHERN CENTRAL DISTRIBUTING, INC. DBA CENTRAL DISTRIBUTING

WESTERN SHOWER DOOR, INC.

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ADELMAN, FRED M

Attorney at MILSTEIN ADELMAN LLP

2800 Donald Douglas Loop N

Santa Monica, CA 90405

INIGUEZ, MIGUEL

MAGRATH, ALEXA L

Defendant Attorney

GLASSMOYER, SCOTT W

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BEVITZ, JOSHUA B

Cross Defendant Attorneys

BAYS, STEPHEN D

MORROW, WILLIAM D

KLAWUNDER, NINA D

Other Attorneys

JEFFERY, MONA J

LETOFSKY, LARRY D

MILIONIS, GEORGE K

SOLTIS, ALEXANDRA E.

SCANLON, TIMOTHY G

MENDOZA, GARRET-MITCHEL P.

CORRELL, DEBORAH A

MURPHY, JASON M

CRESPO, DANIEL A

KIRKPATRICK, CHERYL A

MCCLAIN, ROBYN S

 

Court Documents

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 01/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: (Cont'd from 06/07/17; 08/07/17; 10/06/17) CMO due by 12/29/17; Parties Present Cross Complainant; Attorney: BEVITZ, JOSHUA B

Demurrer First Amended Complaint

Demurrer First Amended Complaint 11/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/26/17 Defendant, CENTEX HOMES Demurrer to PlaintiffsThird Amended Complaint ResID: 27173

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint -- Demurrer is filed but not calendared, no reservation. Street address of the court is 1415 Truxtun.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 10/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 06/7/17; 08/07/17; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 08/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT'D FROM 6/7/17; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Alexa L. Magrath Document: Proposed Summons as to Second Amended Complaint

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: MAGRATH, ALEXA L

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: CROSS-COMPLAINT & SUMMONS: CASE HAS BEEN STAYED.

Case Management Conference

Minute Order - CMC - 11/12/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 11/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT 08/07/18 04/04/18 01/04/18 11/28/17 10/16/17

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 08/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont 08/07/18,10/06/17,1/04/18, 04/04/18

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Timothy Scanlon Document: Perfect Raingutter & Solarscreens Answer to Third Amended Cross-Complaint There is no third amended cross-complaint on file.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 04/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: (Cont'd from 06/07/17; 08/07/17; 10/06/17 01/04/18)

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Alexa Magrath Document: Case Management Statement Judicial Council forms must be used pursuant to Government Code section 68511.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO CROSS-COMPLAINT.

Ruling

Minute Order Dated May 12, 2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ANSWER: NO CROSS-COMPLAINT ON FILE. CASE HAS BEEN STAYED.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: cont'd from 10/16/17, 11/28/17, 01/04/18, 04/04/18, 08/07/19, 11/08/18 and 10/10/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 02/06/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont'd from 10/16/17, 11/28/17, 01/04/18, 04/4/18, 08/07/18, 11/08/18 and 10/10/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Hrg: 2/6/2020 @ 8:15 am in Dept. 10 - Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone: Miguel Iniguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Hrg: 2/6/20 @ 8:15 am in Dept.10 as to Centex Homes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Hrg: 2/6/2020 @ 8:15 am in Dept. 10 - Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone: Jason M. Murphy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Hrg: 2/6/20 @ 8:15 am in Dept.10 as to Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Change of Firm Name and Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 10/10/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT 11/08/18 08/07/18 04/04/18 01/04/18 11/28/17 10/16/17, Status of New Mediator - Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to the following Plaintiffs' ONLY - Without Prejudice - 1. Camerino & Maria Gutierrez, 2. Zulema & Manuel Hernandez, 3. Cristina Juarez, 4. Esmeralda & Rafael Ordonez, 5. Nelson & Elma Villaruz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Hrg: 10/10/19 @ 8:15 am in Dept, 10 - Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone: Joshua B. Bevitz

    Read MoreRead Less
231 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketDeposit of Jury Fees - Comment: FILED BY DAVID B. FERNANDES, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO EACH PARTY AND THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY THE HONORABLE [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME], ON 4/18/2014 AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 4, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.7(a)), ADR Information Packet, Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC, Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO EACH PARTY AND THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P CHAPIN, ON 4/18/2014 AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 4, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.7(a)), ADR Information Packet, Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC, Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: Amount of $1,000.00 for ALMENDAREZ, PETRA (PL-1). Received from ONE LEGAL LLC, check no(s) 3342268. Receipt #765875 for amount of $1,000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for ALMENDAREZ, PETRA (PL-1). Received from ONE LEGAL, check no(s) 3342229. Receipt #763722 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON May 29, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON May 29, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY MILSTEIN ADELMAN LLP CMC 8/12/14 800AM DEPT 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

NEWMEYER & DILLION LLP

p—h

ONEWMEYER & DILLION LLP

JOSEPH A. FERRENTINO, CBN 162855 JOSHUA B. BEVITZ, CBN 221404 JACQUELYN M. MOHR, CBN 278337 1333 N. California Blvd., Suite 600 Walnut Creek, California 94596

(925) 988-3200; (925) 988-3290 (Fax)

Attorneys for Defendant and Cross-Complainant CENTEX HOMES, a Nevada General Partnership

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF KERN

PETRA ALMENDAREZ; JESSE ALMENDAREZ; ROBERTO BATRES; MARY JAN DOMINGUEZ; JASON DOMINGUEZ; STEVEN MARTINEZ; SEAN CACAL; ALOHA FRANCISCO, JAVIER GARIBAY; ROSA GARIBAY; CAMERINO GUTIERREZ; MARIA GUTIERREZ; SANTIAGO RIOS

Plaintiffs, VS.

CENTEX HOMES, A Nevada General Partnership; and DOES 1-1,000, inclusive,

Defendants.

CENTEX HOMES, A Nevada General Partnership,

Cross-Complainants, Vs,

BROKEN DRUM OF BAKERSFIELD, INC.; CASKEY CORPORATION

DBA CENTURY GLASS; CVC CONSTRUCTION CORP.; GARY LEE NELSON; GRANT CONSTRUCTION, INC.; KING DOOR COMPANY, INC.; KINGS RIVER DOOR, INC.,; L & S AIR CONDITIONING & HEATING, INC,; LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC.;

CASE NO.: S-1500-CV-281306 SPC

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CENTEX

HOMES, A NEVADA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP FOR:

(1) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT

TO INDEMNIFY, DEFEND AND OBTAIN INSURANCE;

(2) BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT TO

INDEMNIFY, DEFEND AND OBTAIN INSURANCE;

(3) BREACH OF IMPLIED CONTRACT

TO INDEMNIFY, DEFEND AND OBTAIN INSURANCE;

(4) EQUITABLE INDEMNITY;

(5 CONTRIBUTION AND REPAYMENT;

AND (6) DECLARATORY RELIEF FOR DUTY

TO DEFEND, INDEMNIFY, AND TO

OBTAIN INSURANCE

FILE DATE: February 13, 2014 TRIAL DATE SET: February 8, 2016