This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/05/2021 at 09:41:14 (UTC).

ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY A/S/O MARISOL ZAMORA VS CARRILLO

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY A/S/O MARISOL ZAMORA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARRILLO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5472

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY A/S/O MARISOL ZAMORA

Defendant

CARRILLO, LEONSILLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAO, BRUCE

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/20/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF JOSE GUTIERREZ is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAO, BRUCE