This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 14:38:03 (UTC).

ALLRED TRUST

Case Summary

On 12/22/2015 ALLRED TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Kendall, Andrew and Myers, Brett. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2717

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

Myers, Brett

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CARROLL, JULIE ANN

ALLRED, DENNIS

WEEKS, BRADLEY T

Not Classified By Court

ALLRED, ALMA J

ALLRED, BOBBY LEE

CARROLL, JULIE

ALLRED, BOBBY LEE, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

TRICHELL, VICTORIA M

BIRDSONG, SAMUEL LEE

Not Classified By Court Attorney

HOLLADAY, BRANDON B

 

Court Documents

Accounting Initial

Accounting Initial 05/03/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- THE ALLRED TRUST FIRST ACCOUNTING FOR THE PERIOD SEPTEMBER 2015 THROUGH MAY 2018 05/03/2019 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner: ALLRED, DENNIS; Objector; Attorney: HOLLADAY, BRANDON B; Objector; Attorney: HOLLADAY, BRANDON B

Accounting Initial

Accounting Initial 01/31/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- The allred trust first accounting for the period September 2015 through May 2018 01/31/2019 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner: ALLRED, DENNIS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request to Waive Court Fees; returned via envelope provided

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex parte communication...returned via mail

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw 12/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Notice of Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion, declaration and proof of service...returned via file & serve

Accounting Initial

Accounting Initial 09/14/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: The Allred Trust first accounting for the period September 2015 thru May 2018; Parties Present Objector; Attorney: HOLLADAY, BRANDON B; Objector; Attorney: HOLLADAY, BRANDON B

Ruling

Ruling 06/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Check returned via attorney out basket

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 03/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Petition to Modify Trust for: 1. Modification of Trust Owing to Changed Circumstances, Probate Code section 15409; 2. Approving modification of Trust Probate Code section 17200(b)(13); Parties Present Objector; Attorney: HOLLADAY, BRANDON B; Objector; Attorney: HOLLADAY, BRANDON B

Petition

Petition 11/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Petition to Modify Trust for: 1. Modification of Trust Owing to Changed Circumstances, Probate Code section 15409; 2. Approving modification of Trust Probate Code section 17200(b)(13); Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BIRDSONG, SAMUEL LEE

Petition

Petition 09/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Petition to modify Trust for: 1. Modification of Trust owing to changed circumstances, probate code section 15409 2. Approving modification of Trust, probate code secttion 17200(b)(13)

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Check returned via SASE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Trust...returned via SASE (envelope too small)

Petition

MO Petition for Order: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER OF DISPOSITION OF PROPERTY

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order on first trust accounting for September 1, 2015 to June 19, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview - Accounting Initial 05/03/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- REVIEW RE: THE ALLRED TRUST ACCOUNTING FOR THE PERIOD SEPTEMBER 2015 THROUGH MAY 2018 05/03/2019 CALENDAR #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAccounting Initial - Accounting Initial 05/03/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- THE ALLRED TRUST FIRST ACCOUNTING FOR THE PERIOD SEPTEMBER 2015 THROUGH MAY 2018 05/03/2019 CALENDAR #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketObjections - Comment: Objection to the accounting of the trustee's of the Allred Trust No copies provided

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketReview - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Review re: the Allred trust accounting for the period September 2015 through May 2018 01/31/2019 CALENDAR #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAccounting Initial - Accounting Initial 01/31/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- The allred trust first accounting for the period September 2015 through May 2018 01/31/2019 CALENDAR #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request to Waive Court Fees; returned via envelope provided

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement to first trust accounting for September 1, 2015 to June 19, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketPetition (Subsequent) - Comment: Petition to modify Trust for: 1. Modification of Trust owing to changed circumstances, probate code section 15409 2. Approving modification of Trust, probate code secttion 17200(b)(13)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Check returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Trust...returned via SASE (envelope too small)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Comment: for Petition for Order of Disposition of Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - MO Petition for Order: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER OF DISPOSITION OF PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketCreditors Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 4/7/2016 @ 9:00 a.m. in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketProbate Documents - Requested By: CARROLL, JULIE ANN; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition for order of disposition of property [probate code section 850]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.