This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:47:48 (UTC).

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS PEREZENCISO

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PEREZENCISO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Holladay, Brandon. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5701

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Holladay, Brandon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Defendant

PEREZENCISO, RODOLFO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES, TODD F

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO TODD HAINES: REJECTING DEFAULT FOR RODOLFO PEREZ-ENCISO. DEFAULT WAS FILED PREMATURELY

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO: TODD F. HAINES RE: CMC STATEMENT REASON: PROOF OF SERVICE IS MISSING.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:02/06/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:12

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION; Awarded Against: PEREZENCISO, RODOLFO; Amount; Damages: $12,390.09; Pre-Judgment Interest: $363.56; Costs: $459.00; Total: $13212.65; Party: Names: ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION; PEREZENCISO, RODOLFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: Abstract ISSUED ELECTRONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO RODOLFO PEREZ-ENCISO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Electronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO: TODD F. HAINES RE: CMC STATEMENT REASON: PROOF OF SERVICE IS MISSING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: RE: CCP 585 (D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: AS TO PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Request for Court Judgment - Comment: AS TO RODOLFO PEREZ-ENISO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Request to Enter Default - Comment: Default Only as to RODOLFO PEREZ-ENCISO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Electronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO TODD HAINES: REJECTING DEFAULT FOR RODOLFO PEREZ-ENCISO. DEFAULT WAS FILED PREMATURELY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Rodolfo Perez-Enciso. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:02/06/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less