This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/19/2022 at 11:49:39 (UTC).

ALLEN VS S & S HOMES

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 ALLEN filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against S S HOMES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1472

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMEZCUA, BENJAMIN

COPADO, ROMINA

DELATORRE, DAVID

GARCIA, ROSA

GUAJARDO, STEVE

HERNANDEZ, PALMIRA

HARRIS, JANAI

MARTINEZ, CARLOS

PHILLIPS, HERMAN

PHILLIPS, EDNA

QAZI, KOMAL J.

QAZI, AFSHAN I.

REYES, PEDRINA

RODRIGUEZ, JOSE LUIS

RODRIGUEZ, FLOR

SANDHU, PARAMIJIT

SILVA, JOSE

SILVA, VERONICA

66 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GUTHRIE, LORI J

GUTHRIE LORI J

Other Attorneys

CHAZEN, ALEX M.

CORRELL, DEBORAH A

LOWE, COLEEN H

MCELROY, JULIE D

BRAASCH, DEBRA L

ORLAND, JAMES J

COHEN, ADRIENNE D

MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C

CHAZEN ALEX M.

FELD JASON DANIEL

HOUSMAN WENDY M

VAN RON P.

BRAASCH DEBRA L

RHODES BRIAN W

MCNEILL TIMOTHY C

COHEN ADRIENNE D

MCELROY JULIE D

ORLAND JAMES J

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

08/09/2022: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

08/09/2022: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

08/09/2022: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Order

08/03/2022: Order

Electronic Rejection Notice

07/11/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Ruling

12/17/2021: Ruling

Case Management Statement

06/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer to Cross-Complaint

06/01/2022: Answer to Cross-Complaint

Electronic Rejection Notice

06/01/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

08/24/2021: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

08/24/2021: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

08/24/2021: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

08/13/2021: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Amendment to Complaint

08/19/2021: Amendment to Complaint

Order to Show Cause

07/01/2021: Order to Show Cause

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

06/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

06/30/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

06/25/2021: Complaint

123 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: as to Cross-Defendant Alpha Technologies & Alarm Systems, Inc., a California corporation, ONLY; Filed By: DEFENDANT - S&S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: as to Cross-Defendant Hernandez Masonry, Inc., a California corporation, ONLY; Filed By: DEFENDANT - S&S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: as to Cross-Defendant Hardcastle Specialties, Inc., a California corporation, ONLY; Filed By: DEFENDANT - S&S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order; Comment: Pre-Trial Order No. 5Having read and approved the preceeding Recommendation and proposed dates contained therein, it is approved and made the Order of this Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: TO: Henderson & BorgesonRE: Cross Defendant's Case Management Statement REASON: incorrect hearing date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: CROSS DEFENDANT - D & D PAINTING INC|CROSS DEFENDANT - TIMBERLAKE CABINETRY A DIVISION OF AMERICAN WOODMARK CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Cross-Complaint; Comment: of S & S Homes of the Central Coast Inc; Filed By: CROSS DEFENDANT - 84 LUMBER COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Answer to Cross Complaint; Cross Defendant dismissed on 3/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to 84 Lumber Company, Roe 1, Cross Complaint Amendment, via personal service; Filed By: DEFENDANT - S&S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST INC

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Old River Road, a California Limited Liability Company via personal service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - AMEZCUA, BENJAMIN|PLAINTIFF - ASIDILLA, GILBERT|PLAINTIFF - CASTANEDA, BRENDA LIBRADA|PLAINTIFF - COPADO, ROMINA|PLAINTIFF - DELATORRE, DAVID|PLAINTIFF - ESQUIVEL, OLIVIA|PLAINTIFF - ESQUIVEL, VINCENT|PLAINTIFF - FOX-SKINNER, STACY|PLAINTIFF - GARCIA, ROSA|PLAINTIFF - GONZALEZ, JUAN RAMON|PLAINTIFF - GONZALEZ, MARY JANE|PLAINTIFF - GUAJARDO, STEVE|PLAINTIFF - HARRIS, JANAI|PLAINTIFF - HERNANDEZ, PALMIRA|PLAINTIFF - LEEN, BRITTNEY N.|PLAINTIFF - LEEN, WILLIAM M.|PLAINTIFF - MACHADO, FERNANDO|PLAINTIFF - MARQUEZ, VERONICA|PLAINTIFF - MARTINEZ, CARLOS|PLAINTIFF - PARK, HOON|PLAINTIFF - PHILLIPS, EDNA|PLAINTIFF - PHILLIPS, HERMAN|PLAINTIFF - QAZI, AFSHAN I.|PLAINTIFF - QAZI, KOMAL J.|PLAINTIFF - RAMOS, PATRICIA|PLAINTIFF - RAMOS, RAMIRO|PLAINTIFF - REYES, PEDRINA|PLAINTIFF - RIZO LOPEZ, CRUZ MANUEL|PLAINTIFF - RODRIGUEZ, FLOR|PLAINTIFF - RODRIGUEZ, JOSE LUIS|PLAINTIFF - SANDHU, PARAMIJIT|PLAINTIFF - SILVA, JOSE|PLAINTIFF - SILVA, VERONICA|PLAINTIFF - SKINNER, TIM|PLAINTIFF - TORRES, JEANNETTE H.|PLAINTIFF - TORRES, SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to D&A Premier Properties, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company via personal service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - AMEZCUA, BENJAMIN|PLAINTIFF - ASIDILLA, GILBERT|PLAINTIFF - CASTANEDA, BRENDA LIBRADA|PLAINTIFF - COPADO, ROMINA|PLAINTIFF - DELATORRE, DAVID|PLAINTIFF - ESQUIVEL, OLIVIA|PLAINTIFF - ESQUIVEL, VINCENT|PLAINTIFF - FOX-SKINNER, STACY|PLAINTIFF - GARCIA, ROSA|PLAINTIFF - GONZALEZ, JUAN RAMON|PLAINTIFF - GONZALEZ, MARY JANE|PLAINTIFF - GUAJARDO, STEVE|PLAINTIFF - HARRIS, JANAI|PLAINTIFF - HERNANDEZ, PALMIRA|PLAINTIFF - LEEN, BRITTNEY N.|PLAINTIFF - LEEN, WILLIAM M.|PLAINTIFF - MACHADO, FERNANDO|PLAINTIFF - MARQUEZ, VERONICA|PLAINTIFF - MARTINEZ, CARLOS|PLAINTIFF - PARK, HOON|PLAINTIFF - PHILLIPS, EDNA|PLAINTIFF - PHILLIPS, HERMAN|PLAINTIFF - QAZI, AFSHAN I.|PLAINTIFF - QAZI, KOMAL J.|PLAINTIFF - RAMOS, PATRICIA|PLAINTIFF - RAMOS, RAMIRO|PLAINTIFF - REYES, PEDRINA|PLAINTIFF - RIZO LOPEZ, CRUZ MANUEL|PLAINTIFF - RODRIGUEZ, FLOR|PLAINTIFF - RODRIGUEZ, JOSE LUIS|PLAINTIFF - SANDHU, PARAMIJIT|PLAINTIFF - SILVA, JOSE|PLAINTIFF - SILVA, VERONICA|PLAINTIFF - SKINNER, TIM|PLAINTIFF - TORRES, JEANNETTE H.|PLAINTIFF - TORRES, SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to River Ranch Community, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company via personal service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - AMEZCUA, BENJAMIN|PLAINTIFF - ASIDILLA, GILBERT|PLAINTIFF - CASTANEDA, BRENDA LIBRADA|PLAINTIFF - COPADO, ROMINA|PLAINTIFF - DELATORRE, DAVID|PLAINTIFF - ESQUIVEL, OLIVIA|PLAINTIFF - ESQUIVEL, VINCENT|PLAINTIFF - FOX-SKINNER, STACY|PLAINTIFF - GARCIA, ROSA|PLAINTIFF - GONZALEZ, JUAN RAMON|PLAINTIFF - GONZALEZ, MARY JANE|PLAINTIFF - GUAJARDO, STEVE|PLAINTIFF - HARRIS, JANAI|PLAINTIFF - HERNANDEZ, PALMIRA|PLAINTIFF - LEEN, BRITTNEY N.|PLAINTIFF - LEEN, WILLIAM M.|PLAINTIFF - MACHADO, FERNANDO|PLAINTIFF - MARQUEZ, VERONICA|PLAINTIFF - MARTINEZ, CARLOS|PLAINTIFF - PARK, HOON|PLAINTIFF - PHILLIPS, EDNA|PLAINTIFF - PHILLIPS, HERMAN|PLAINTIFF - QAZI, AFSHAN I.|PLAINTIFF - QAZI, KOMAL J.|PLAINTIFF - RAMOS, PATRICIA|PLAINTIFF - RAMOS, RAMIRO|PLAINTIFF - REYES, PEDRINA|PLAINTIFF - RIZO LOPEZ, CRUZ MANUEL|PLAINTIFF - RODRIGUEZ, FLOR|PLAINTIFF - RODRIGUEZ, JOSE LUIS|PLAINTIFF - SANDHU, PARAMIJIT|PLAINTIFF - SILVA, JOSE|PLAINTIFF - SILVA, VERONICA|PLAINTIFF - SKINNER, TIM|PLAINTIFF - TORRES, JEANNETTE H.|PLAINTIFF - TORRES, SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to S & S Homes of the Central Coast, Inc., a California Corporation via personal service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - AMEZCUA, BENJAMIN|PLAINTIFF - ASIDILLA, GILBERT|PLAINTIFF - CASTANEDA, BRENDA LIBRADA|PLAINTIFF - COPADO, ROMINA|PLAINTIFF - DELATORRE, DAVID|PLAINTIFF - ESQUIVEL, OLIVIA|PLAINTIFF - ESQUIVEL, VINCENT|PLAINTIFF - FOX-SKINNER, STACY|PLAINTIFF - GARCIA, ROSA|PLAINTIFF - GONZALEZ, JUAN RAMON|PLAINTIFF - GONZALEZ, MARY JANE|PLAINTIFF - GUAJARDO, STEVE|PLAINTIFF - HARRIS, JANAI|PLAINTIFF - HERNANDEZ, PALMIRA|PLAINTIFF - LEEN, BRITTNEY N.|PLAINTIFF - LEEN, WILLIAM M.|PLAINTIFF - MACHADO, FERNANDO|PLAINTIFF - MARQUEZ, VERONICA|PLAINTIFF - MARTINEZ, CARLOS|PLAINTIFF - PARK, HOON|PLAINTIFF - PHILLIPS, EDNA|PLAINTIFF - PHILLIPS, HERMAN|PLAINTIFF - QAZI, AFSHAN I.|PLAINTIFF - QAZI, KOMAL J.|PLAINTIFF - RAMOS, PATRICIA|PLAINTIFF - RAMOS, RAMIRO|PLAINTIFF - REYES, PEDRINA|PLAINTIFF - RIZO LOPEZ, CRUZ MANUEL|PLAINTIFF - RODRIGUEZ, FLOR|PLAINTIFF - RODRIGUEZ, JOSE LUIS|PLAINTIFF - SANDHU, PARAMIJIT|PLAINTIFF - SILVA, JOSE|PLAINTIFF - SILVA, VERONICA|PLAINTIFF - SKINNER, TIM|PLAINTIFF - TORRES, JEANNETTE H.|PLAINTIFF - TORRES, SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Amendment to Complaint; Comment: Plaintiffs' First Amendment to Complaint Naming Additional HomeownersNew Plaintiffs':Cruz Manuel Rizo LopezBrenda Librada CastanedaWilliam M. LeenBrittney N. LeenGilbert AsidillaVincent EsquivelOlivia EsquivelJuan Ramon GonzalezMary Jane GonzalezTim SkinnerStacy Fox-SkinnerTerrence C. WillisFernando Machado

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Comment: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 10/13/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AMHearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - AMEZCUA, BENJAMIN|PLAINTIFF - COPADO, ROMINA|PLAINTIFF - DELATORRE, DAVID|PLAINTIFF - GARCIA, ROSA|PLAINTIFF - GUAJARDO, STEVE|PLAINTIFF - HARRIS, JANAI|PLAINTIFF - HERNANDEZ, PALMIRA|PLAINTIFF - MARQUEZ, VERONICA|PLAINTIFF - MARTINEZ, CARLOS|PLAINTIFF - PARK, HOON|PLAINTIFF - PHILLIPS, EDNA|PLAINTIFF - PHILLIPS, HERMAN|PLAINTIFF - QAZI, AFSHAN I.|PLAINTIFF - QAZI, KOMAL J.|PLAINTIFF - RAMOS, PATRICIA|PLAINTIFF - RAMOS, RAMIRO|PLAINTIFF - REYES, PEDRINA|PLAINTIFF - RODRIGUEZ, FLOR|PLAINTIFF - RODRIGUEZ, JOSE LUIS|PLAINTIFF - SANDHU, PARAMIJIT|PLAINTIFF - SILVA, JOSE|PLAINTIFF - SILVA, VERONICA|PLAINTIFF - TORRES, JEANNETTE H.|PLAINTIFF - TORRES, SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - AMEZCUA, BENJAMIN|PLAINTIFF - COPADO, ROMINA|PLAINTIFF - DELATORRE, DAVID|PLAINTIFF - GARCIA, ROSA|PLAINTIFF - GUAJARDO, STEVE|PLAINTIFF - HARRIS, JANAI|PLAINTIFF - HERNANDEZ, PALMIRA|PLAINTIFF - MARQUEZ, VERONICA|PLAINTIFF - MARTINEZ, CARLOS|PLAINTIFF - PARK, HOON|PLAINTIFF - PHILLIPS, EDNA|PLAINTIFF - PHILLIPS, HERMAN|PLAINTIFF - QAZI, AFSHAN I.|PLAINTIFF - QAZI, KOMAL J.|PLAINTIFF - RAMOS, PATRICIA|PLAINTIFF - RAMOS, RAMIRO|PLAINTIFF - REYES, PEDRINA|PLAINTIFF - RODRIGUEZ, FLOR|PLAINTIFF - RODRIGUEZ, JOSE LUIS|PLAINTIFF - SANDHU, PARAMIJIT|PLAINTIFF - SILVA, JOSE|PLAINTIFF - SILVA, VERONICA|PLAINTIFF - TORRES, JEANNETTE H.|PLAINTIFF - TORRES, SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAN RON P.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lowe, Coleen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAZEN ALEX MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RHODES, BRIAN W