This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/26/2023 at 07:22:58 (UTC).

ALI VS FAVORITE HEALTHCARE STAFFING, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/01/2023 ALI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against FAVORITE HEALTHCARE STAFFING, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, T. Mark. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0611

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, T. Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALI, KASSIDY

Defendants

BAKERSFIELD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC

FAVORITE HEALTHCARE STAFFING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRADBURY, KENT L.

Defendant Attorney

JENKINS, NATHANIEL H.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

03/01/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

03/01/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

03/01/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

03/01/2023: Order to Show Cause

Electronic Rejection Notice

04/14/2023: Electronic Rejection Notice

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

05/11/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

05/11/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Answer to Complaint

05/18/2023: Answer to Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

06/05/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

03/01/2023: Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

Rejection/Correction Notice

04/14/2023: Rejection/Correction Notice

Ruling 07/11/2023

07/11/2023: Ruling 07/11/2023

Rejection/Correction Notice

08/16/2023: Rejection/Correction Notice

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/02/2024

DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Pursuant to Califronia Rules of Court, Rule 3.1385

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay); Comment: With Prejudice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketElectronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Re. Case Management Statement. A Notice of Conditional Settlement was filed 7/07/23. A Ruling was mailed out 7/11/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

HearingCase Number: BCV-23-100611; Style/Defendant: ALI VS FAVORITE HEALTHCARE STAFFING, INC. ET AL; Case Type: 36-CV Wrongful Termination - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Ruling; Location: B-Civil; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRuling; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketNotice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Bakersfield Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC dba The Rehabilitation Center of Bakersfield, via Mail service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketAnswer to Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to FAVORITE HEALTHCARE STAFFING, INC., via Mail service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Favorite Healthcare Staffing, LLC, via Mail service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketElectronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Re: Proof of Service Reason: Attorney represented filing must be submitted via mandatory E-file

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023

DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents; Served: 04/06/2023; Served: 04/06/2023; Served: 05/23/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 6/21/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: H

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023

DocketSummons Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less