Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:07:18 (UTC).

ALFRED E. HOWELL, TRUSTEE OF THE ALFRED E. HOWELL REVOCABLE TRUST, ESTABLISHED APRIL 4, 2011 AND AMENDED ON OCTOBER 15, 2014 VS HOWELL ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/13/2015 ALFRED E HOWELL, TRUSTEE OF THE ALFRED E HOWELL REVOCABLE TRUST, ESTABLISHED APRIL 4, 2011 AND AMENDED ON OCTOBER 15, 2014 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HOWELL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0471

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALFRED E. HOWELL, TRUSTEE OF THE ALFRED E. HOWELL REVOCABLE TRUST, ESTABLISHED APRIL 4, 2011 AND AMENDED ON OCTOBER 15, 2014

Defendants

HOWELL, LILLIAN S.

HOWELL, MICHAEL R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOWMAN, STACY H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: ALFRED E. HOWELL, TRUSTEE OF THE ALFRED E. HOWELL REVOCABLE TRUST, ESTABLISHED APRIL 4, 2011 AND AMENDED ON OCTOBER 15, 2014; HOWELL, MICHAEL R.; HOWELL, LILLIAN S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without prejudice as to entire action. Returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/30/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less