This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/12/2020 at 04:11:48 (UTC).

ALEXANDER V ALEXANDER (D)

Case Summary

On 07/11/2011 ALEXANDER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALEXANDER D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gill, Susan M., Benavides, Jose R., Compton, James L., Fielder, John L. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8216

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gill, Susan M.

Benavides, Jose R.

Compton, James L.

Fielder, John L.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALEXANDER, KAREN L

Respondent

ALEXANDER, EDDIE D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

GREENE, BENJAMIN R

CLOUD, BOBBY L

Respondent Attorney

HART, CARL W, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Contempt (Petitioner)

Order to Show Cause in re: Contempt (Petitioner) 09/08/2016: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET OSC AND AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTEMPT; Parties Present Petitioner: ALEXANDER, KAREN L; Respondent: ALEXANDER, EDDIE D

Order to Show Cause in re Contempt (Petitioner)

Order to Show Cause in re Contempt (Petitioner) 10/06/2016: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET OSC AND AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTEMPT CONT FROM 9/8

Order to Show Cause in re Contempt (Petitioner)

Order to Show Cause in re Contempt (Petitioner) 11/03/2016: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET OSC AND AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTEMPT CONT'D FROM 10/6/16; Parties Present Petitioner: ALEXANDER, KAREN L; Respondent: ALEXANDER, EDDIE D

Order to Show Cause in re: Contempt

12/22/2016 MO: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTEMPT: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET OSC AND AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTEMPT CONT'D FROM 11/03

Order to Show Cause in re: Contempt

01/12/2017 MO: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: CONTEMPT: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET OSC AND AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTEMPT CONT FROM 12/22; Parties Present Petitioner: ALEXANDER, KAREN L; Respondent: ALEXANDER, EDDIE D

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PRO PER PICKUP

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 02/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES MOD S/S NO SERVICE; Parties Present Respondent: ALEXANDER, EDDIE D

Order to Show Cause in re: Contempt

Order to Show Cause in re: Contempt 07/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 7/26/16 PET OSC AND AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTEMPT CONT FROM 01/12 *5

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 11/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 10/5/17 RES MOD S/S 16COURT--13COURT; Parties Present Petitioner: ALEXANDER, KAREN L; Attorney: CLOUD, BOBBY L; Respondent: ALEXANDER, EDDIE D

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 01/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 12/18/2017 RES MOD S/S; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CLOUD, BOBBY L; Respondent: ALEXANDER, EDDIE D

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 03/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 12/18/2017 RES MOD S/S CONT FROM 01/22

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 04/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/18/2017 RES MOD S/S CONT FROM 01/22 and 03/09 *2

Motion

Motion 09/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/17/18 PET NOM TO BE RELIEVED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: HRG 9/19/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Motion 09/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/17/18 PET NOM TO BE RELIEVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: TO BE RELIEVED Hearing Date:9/19/18 Hearing Time: D Hearing Department/Division:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: FROM SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: FOAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: HRG: 4/25/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 04/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/18/2017 RES MOD S/S CONT FROM 01/22 and 03/09 *2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 03/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 12/18/2017 RES MOD S/S CONT FROM 01/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: OF CLIENT UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2011
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Petitioner - Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Petitioner; Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: PET OSC S/S ATTY F/C WAGE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • Docket806S Pmt: First Appearance Family Law GC 70670(D) (10/19/10) - Comment: Amount of $395.00 for ALEXANDER, EDDIE D (RE-1). Received from DONALD F BUTZ, check no(s) 17765. Receipt #606291 for amount of $395.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • DocketResponsive Declaration - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • DocketResponse - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • Docket805K Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (10/19/10) - Comment: Amount of $395.00 for ALEXANDER, KAREN L (PE-1). Received from BENJAMIN GREENE, check no(s) 12228. Receipt #601214 for amount of $395.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: RE:PET OSC ATTY FEES & COSTS, S/S, WAGE ASSIGN. ORDER HEARING DATE:8/11/11 @8:30 DEPT C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 53

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HART, CARL W, Jr.