Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:00:10 (UTC).

ALDAWOOD VS ALFARAH

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 ALDAWOOD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALFARAH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D., Fielder, John L., Compton, James L. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1668

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Fielder, John L.

Compton, James L.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALDAWOOD, ANGHAM

Respondent

ALFARAH, WARED

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND SPOUSAL SUPPORT: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S S/S 1 MINOR NO SERVICE

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

FEE WAIVER GRANTED: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET 1 FW $435; Parties Present Petitioner: ALDAWOOD, ANGHAM

Ex Parte Hearing

EX PARTE HEARING PETITIONER CHILD SUPPORT, SPOUSAL SUPPORT, CHILD: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET EX PARTE C/C C/V C/S S/S 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: ALDAWOOD, ANGHAM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: ALDAWOOD, ANGHAM; ALFARAH, WARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Notice Re Payment of Support - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 1/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT AND SPOUSAL SUPPORT: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S S/S 1 MINOR NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Appearance Stipulation and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2015
  • Temporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S S/S 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Hearing - EX PARTE HEARING PETITIONER CHILD SUPPORT, SPOUSAL SUPPORT, CHILD: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET EX PARTE C/C C/V C/S S/S 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: ALDAWOOD, ANGHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Ex Parte Compliance - Comment: Hearing Date: 7/23/15 Hearing Time: 11:00AM Hearing Department/Division:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less