This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 00:13:35 (UTC).

ALDANA VS EVANS

Case Summary

On 04/05/2017 ALDANA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EVANS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0759

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALDANA, ELISA F.

ALDANA, BRIANNA

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BAKERSFIELD PROPERTIES, INC.

THE EDGE HOLDINGS COMPANY, LLC

EVANS, BONNIE

GOMEZ, YOLANDA P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUIGG, VINCENT J

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HALL, ANN C

HERRERA, ALEJANDRO H.

WESTON, CHRISTOPHER G

 

Court Documents

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 02/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont 12/01/17 pending answer on xcomplaint; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: WESTON, CHRISTOPHER G

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO VINCENT J QUIGG: REJECTING STATEMENT OF DAMAGES AND REQUEST FOR DEFAULT. THE APPLICATION/ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WAS SIGNED ON 12/6/17 FOR ABOVE NOTED DOCUMENTS. THE COURT MUST RECEIVE PROOF OF PUBLICATION BY WAY OF AN ORIGINAL NEWSPAPER ARTICLE SHOWING 4 WEEKS OF PUBLICATION. WE HAVE NOT RECEIVED THE PROOF OF PUBLICATION.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 12/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: QUIGG, VINCENT J; Plaintiff; Attorney: QUIGG, VINCENT J; Defendant; Attorney: HALL, ANN C; Defendant; Attorney: WESTON, CHRISTOPHER G; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HALL, ANN C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HERRERA, ALEJANDRO H.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT & ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT. DEFAULT FILED ON 9/22/17.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: GENERAL DENIAL. PARTY LISTED IS NOT A CROSS-DEFENDANT & FIRST APPEARANCE FEES MUST BE PAID AT THE TIME OF FILING.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: CROSS- COMPLAINT (& SUMMONS) MISSING POS.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: CROSS COMPLAINT MISSING POS & FIRST APPEARANCE FEES MUST BE PAID AT THE TIME OF FILING.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: GENERAL DENIAL MISSING POS

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 02/27/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: to be heard with bcv-15-101204 Mr. Quigg is to Personally appear at OSC hearing. **NO COURT CALL ALLOWED**

Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement

Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement 02/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/15/2020 Plaintiff, ELISA F. ALDANA; BRIANNA ALDANA Motion for Confirmation of Good Faith Settlement and to the Enforcement of Defendant the Edge Holdings Company to Said Settlement Agreement Pursuant to CCP 664.6 ResID: 36819

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: CMC Statement: There is not a Case Management Conference on calendar for 1/27/2020

Order to Show Cause in re: Contempt (Post-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 10/29/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: set by the court

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Amended MO Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 10/01/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: crc 3.1385 (resolved or all parties appear) BCV 15 101204

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 06/20/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Finalization of Settlement of Complaint ONLY (TO BE HEARD WITH bcv 15 101204

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 04/16/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Finalization of Settlement of Complaint ONLY

Ruling

Minute Order 9/18/2018: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Minute Order 9/7/2018: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCourt Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: as to Bakersfield Properties only cont'd from 02/27/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: to be heard with BCV-15-101204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCourt Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 02/27/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: as to Bakersfield properties only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 02/27/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: to be heard with bcv-15-101204 Mr. Quigg is to Personally appear at OSC hearing. **NO COURT CALL ALLOWED**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Vincent J. Quigg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketOrder Confirming Good Faith Settlement - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: on behalf of: The Edge Holdings Company, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Determine Good Faith Settlement - Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement 02/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/15/2020 Plaintiff, ELISA F. ALDANA; BRIANNA ALDANA Motion for Confirmation of Good Faith Settlement and to the Enforcement of Defendant the Edge Holdings Company to Said Settlement Agreement Pursuant to CCP 664.6 ResID: 36819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: CMC Statement: There is not a Case Management Conference on calendar for 1/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/10/2017; Served: 07/07/2017; Served: 07/31/2017; Served: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/24/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURN VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketStatement of Damages - Comment: of Brianna Aldana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketStatement of Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketStatement of Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketStatement of Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketStatement of Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Envelope Details

Court Fee

Service Fee

Rejection Information

Rejection -~ lime

Reason

10/24/2017 Q _ 32

19 - Rejected 105536 AM

Documents Lead Document

Associated Parties Party/Business Name

THE EDGE HOLDINGS COMPANY. LLC

Answer to Complaint (No Fee)

Filing Type

Filing Code

Filing Description Reference Number Comments

Status

Fees

Court I'ee

Service Fee

Rejection Information Rejection : chason Time