This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/24/2021 at 07:21:25 (UTC).

ALCORN FENCE COMPANY VS SECURITY PAVING COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 ALCORN FENCE COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SECURITY PAVING COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1197

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALCORN FENCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

SECURITY PAVING COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STATE OF CALIFORNIA, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A DIVISION OF THE STATE OF CA

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A DIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY

SECURITY PAVING COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAROOTIAN, SHARICE B.

Defendant Attorney

SHAFFER, ROBERT H., Jr.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/08/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Request for Dismissal as to the Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action, With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Security Paving Company, Inc., a California corporation via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Continental Casualty Company, an Illinois corporation via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Commencement of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/15/20213:14 PM; Unserved; Served: 06/11/202112:40 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/08/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alcorn Fence Company is a litigant

Latest cases where SECURITY PAVING COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Continental Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAFFER JR ROBERT H.