This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:17:25 (UTC).

ALBA VS ALBA

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 ALBA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALBA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4717

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALBA, TINA A

Respondent

ALBA, JAVIER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Comment: STATUS ENDS: 1/31/14 JLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Request to Enter Default - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Declaration for Default - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: PET PRELIMINARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 614

    Read MoreRead Less