This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 23:15:07 (UTC).

AIVAZIAN VS THOMAS

Case Summary

On 05/16/2016 AIVAZIAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against THOMAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Woodward, Cory J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0084

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Woodward, Cory J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AIVAZIAN, CLAUDIA

Defendant

THOMAS, HEATHER ASHLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOSTER, STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO - UD CASE FILED 5-16-16: Judicial Officer(s): Woodward, Cory J., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: AIVAZIAN, CLAUDIA; Attorney: BOSTER, STEVEN; Defendant: THOMAS, HEATHER ASHLEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing; Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: AIVAZIAN, CLAUDIA; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 128 West Haloid Ave. Ridgecrest, CA 93555; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: THOMAS, HEATHER ASHLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Writ of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution Possession or - Comment: Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Judgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Woodward, Cory J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO - UD CASE FILED 5-16-16: Judicial Officer(s): Woodward, Cory J., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: AIVAZIAN, CLAUDIA; Attorney: BOSTER, STEVEN; Defendant: THOMAS, HEATHER ASHLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Notice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: In Pro Per New Attorney: Steven Boster

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Unknown Tenants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: AIVAZIAN, CLAUDIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.