This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:42:46 (UTC).

AHIR VS JATIN AHIR (C)

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 AHIR filed a Family - Marriage Annulment lawsuit against JATIN AHIR C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L. and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1908

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Annulment

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AHIR, JATIN

Respondent

JATIN AHIR, VIBHUTIBEN

 

Court Documents

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 06/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCCR CONTD FROM 02/19/19 04/02/19

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 04/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: FCCR CONTD FROM 02/19/19

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 12/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: FCCR SET FROM 09/17/18

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 11/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/5/18 RES SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT OST--SERVICE PENDING

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 09/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/31/18 RES SET ASIDE DEFAULT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Default

Default 10/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 09/06/17 PET NULLITY; Parties Present Petitioner: AHIR, JATIN

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: MARITAL STATUS ENDS 08/15/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 06/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCCR CONTD FROM 02/19/19 04/02/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 04/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: FCCR CONTD FROM 02/19/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure - Comment: HRG 04/02/19 DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketBrief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Nullity (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: SET ASIDE GRANTED HRG 9/17/18 & 11/15/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault - Default 10/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 09/06/17 PET NULLITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketDefault Setting Card - Comment: Hearing Date: 10/03/17 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WITH ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: STACY WILLARD - A Helping Hand #140

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketPetition for Nullity - Comment: IN THE ALTERNATIVE DISSO

    Read MoreRead Less