This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:55:12 (UTC).

AHERN RENTALS, INC. , A NEVADA CORPORATION VS NATIONAL AG, INC., A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN; RAMONA NUNEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 AHERN RENTALS, INC , A NEVADA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NATIONAL AG, INC , A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN RAMONA NUNEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0998

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AHERN RENTALS, INC. , A NEVADA CORPORATION

Defendants

NATIONAL AG, INC., A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN

NUNEZ, RAMONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIPSCHULTZ, JAMES D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: AHERN RENTALS, INC. , A NEVADA CORPORATION; Awarded Against: NATIONAL AG, INC., A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN; NUNEZ, RAMONA; Amount; Damages: $19,082.05; Pre-Judgment Interest: $2,529.19; Attorney Fees: $589.90; Total: $22201.14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: ISSUED/DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN/MONEY/DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs and Credits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Interest Calculation Summary Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: in Lieu of Testimony {CCP 585(d)}

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to National AG, INC., a business entity, form unknown and Ramona Nunez, an individual

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to Does 1-20, Inclusive,Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: personal, as to Ramona Nunez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: substituted, as to National AG, Inc., a business entity, form unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PREPAID ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10-26-2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY JAMES D. LIPSCHULTZ CMC 1-11-2016 8:30 AM D12

    Read MoreRead Less