Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 18:58:38 (UTC).

AGUIRRE VS VALDOVINOS

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 AGUIRRE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VALDOVINOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L., Compton, James L., Schuett, Stephen D., Stainfield, Bryan K. and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1624

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Compton, James L.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AGUIRRE, ELEAZAR

Respondent

VALDOVINOS, FAVIOLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

GREENE, BENJAMIN R

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; HEARING ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO ELEAZAR AGUIRRE: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW $520

Court Trial

12/07/2016 MO: COURT TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Reset; Comment: TIME EST: 1 DAY CONT'D FROM 11/10/16; Parties Present Petitioner: AGUIRRE, ELEAZAR; Respondent: VALDOVINOS, FAVIOLA; Attorney: GREENE, BENJAMIN R

Motion for Sanctions

11/10/16 MO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE/MOTION FOR SANCTIONS: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: POSSIBLE SANCTIONS **MSC CAL ALSO**; Parties Present Respondent: VALDOVINOS, FAVIOLA; Attorney: GREENE, BENJAMIN R

Request for Order - Petitioner

PET RFO - MEDIATION AGREEMENT PLUS HOLIDAYS: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET C/C C/V 2 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: AGUIRRE, ELEAZAR; Respondent: VALDOVINOS, FAVIOLA

Mandatory Settlement Conference

1/05/17 MO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: AGUIRRE, ELEAZAR; Respondent: VALDOVINOS, FAVIOLA; Attorney: GREENE, BENJAMIN R

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 10/13/2016: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: TIME EST: 1 DAY CONT'D FROM 9/01/16; Parties Present Respondent: VALDOVINOS, FAVIOLA; Attorney: GREENE, BENJAMIN R

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/01/2016: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: EST TIME 1 DAY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Judgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 10/18/17 SIGNED PURSUANT TO C.C.P 635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Child Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - 1/05/17 MO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: AGUIRRE, ELEAZAR; Respondent: VALDOVINOS, FAVIOLA; Attorney: GREENE, BENJAMIN R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Settlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Findings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: HRG. 11/10/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Trial - 12/07/2016 MO: COURT TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Reset; Comment: TIME EST: 1 DAY CONT'D FROM 11/10/16; Parties Present Petitioner: AGUIRRE, ELEAZAR; Respondent: VALDOVINOS, FAVIOLA; Attorney: GREENE, BENJAMIN R

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2015
  • Mediation Appointment - Original Type: Mediation Appointment; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY FATHER SPANISH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing on Waiver of Fees - Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; HEARING ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO ELEAZAR AGUIRRE: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW $520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: hrg 08/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PET HRG DATE: 8/14/15 DIV. D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Master, Calendar Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less