This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:17:20 (UTC).

AGUILERA V AGUILERA

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 AGUILERA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AGUILERA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4710

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AGUILERA, DENISE P

Respondent

AGUILERA, MANUEL J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2014
  • 182B Pmt: Certified Copy of Dissolution GC 70674 EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $15.00 for AGUILERA, DENISE P (PE-1). Received from AGUILERA, DENISE P, check no(s) 39771347. Receipt #767987 for amount of $15.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: RESP- NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Comment: STATUS ENDS 1/30/2014 JLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • Declaration for Default - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • Request to Enter Default - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: RETURNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT VIA WE THE PEOPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: WE THE PEOPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • 805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for AGUILERA, DENISE P (PE-1). Received from WE THE PEOPLE, check no(s) 8545. Receipt #709240 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 626

    Read MoreRead Less