This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/08/2020 at 04:56:25 (UTC).

A.F.S. VS FLOREZ

Case Summary

On 01/31/2008 A F S filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FLOREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mettler, Sharon. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5368

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mettler, Sharon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A.F.S.

Defendant

LOPEZ, VICTORIANO F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRACHFELD, ERICA L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2008
  • Docket839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 - Comment: Amount of $1.00 for A.F.S. (PL-1). Received from OFFICIAL PAYMENT CORP.. Receipt #401972 for amount of $1.00. Detail: FAX FILED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2008
  • Docket839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 - Comment: Receipt #401758 entered by Deputy #431 on 8/1/2008 11:13:01 AM in the amount of $1.00 voided due to CLERICAL ERROR; voided by Deputy #128 on 8/1/2008 at 2:22:58 PM with void transaction #401835.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2008
  • Docket839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 - Comment: Amount of $1.00 for A.F.S. (PL-1). Received from OFFICIAL PAYMENTS CORP.. Receipt #401758 for amount of $1.00. Detail: FAX FILED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2008
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2008
  • DocketNP1430 - Comment: Department: AL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):1:46. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY BY ATTORNEY ERICA BRACHFELD NO APPEARANCE BY VICTORIANO F LOPEZ THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: REFER MATTER TO CIVIL CLERK TO SET AS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DISMISSAL WITHIN STATUTORY TIME. IF NO DEFAULT---MATTER TO BE DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2008
  • Docket4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) - Comment: New Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2008
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mettler, Sharon; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2008
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: FILED BY PLAINTIFF: A.F.S. ASSIGNEE OF GE MONEY BA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2008
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; STATEMENT OF LOCATION; DECLARATION OF JURISDICTIONAL FACTS; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WHO SERVED: VICTORIANO F LOPEZ HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 02/13/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2008
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2008
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2008
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: New Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2008
  • Docket843Q Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) (1/1/06) - Comment: Amount of $180.00 for A.F.S. (PL-1). Received from ERICA L BRACHFELD, A PROFESSIONAL CORP., check no(s) 11431. Receipt #367398 for amount of $180.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2008
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 431

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brachfeld, Erica L