This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/29/2020 at 06:29:31 (UTC).

ACOSTA VS WONDERFUL NURSERIES LLC.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 ACOSTA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WONDERFUL NURSERIES LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0790

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ACOSTA, MARIA ANA

ACOSTA

Defendants

WONDERFUL NURSERIES LLC., A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CREAM OF THE CROP AG SERVICE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CREAM OF THE CROP AG SERVICE, INC

WONDERFUL NURSERIES LLC

WONDERFUL NURSERIES LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIBIYAN, DAVID D

Defendant Attorneys

MOODY, PATRICK S

HAMMOND, BROOKE S

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/01/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 5/28/2020; Motion to Compel Arbitration; Defendant Wonderful Nurseries LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketPetition - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Filed 5/22/2020, by Defendant Cream of the Crop Ag Service, Inc, Petition to Compel Arbitration in Lieu of an Answer and to Stay Proceedings.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Brooke S. Hammond in support of Errata re: Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketErrata - Comment: re: Motion to Compel Arbitrattion adding Request for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Class Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) - Comment: 20STCV19656 - Los Angeles County Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Brooke Hammond in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketPetition (Subsequent) - Comment: to Compel Arbitration in Lieu of an Answer and to Stay Proceedings; Declaration of Seth Mehrten in Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Wonderful Nurseries LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Cream of the Crop AG Services, Inc. a California Corporation via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: as to Plaintiff's Counsel David D. Bibiyan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/29/202012:40 PM; Served: 04/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/01/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.