This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:03:35 (UTC).

ACOSTA VS VARGAS

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 ACOSTA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VARGAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0069

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACOSTA, ERNESTO

Defendant

VARGAS, ANGEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Palmer, William D.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: ACOSTA, ERNESTO; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1947 4TH STREET (BACK ROOM) WASCO, CA 93280 KERN COUNTY; Awarded Against: VARGAS, ANGEL; Party: Names: ACOSTA, ERNESTO; VARGAS, ANGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ACOSTA, ERNESTO; Served: 03/23/20171:05 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketCourt Interpreter Services - CV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 1947 4TH STREET (BACK ROOM) WASCO, CA 93280 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less