Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 18:59:17 (UTC).

ACOSTA VS SALINAS, Jr.

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 ACOSTA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SALINAS, Jr. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L. and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1625

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ACOSTA, ERICA

Respondent

SALINAS, JOSE LUIS, Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 02/10/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less