This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:45:28 (UTC).

ACCLAIM CREDIT TECHNOLOGIES VS JAIMES

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 ACCLAIM CREDIT TECHNOLOGIES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAIMES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Stainfield, Bryan K. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0059

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACCLAIM CREDIT TECHNOLOGIES

Defendants

JAIMES, SHANTALE M.

JAIMES, SHANTALE MARIE

JONES, SHANTALE MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOCH, STEVEN M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs and Credits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs and Credits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Shantale M. Haimes aka Shantale Marie Jaimes aka Shantale Marie Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less