This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 00:57:07 (UTC).

ACCLAIM CREDIT TECHNOLOGIES VS CONNORS

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 ACCLAIM CREDIT TECHNOLOGIES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CONNORS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3100

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACCLAIM CREDIT TECHNOLOGIES

Defendant

CONNORS, RODNEY A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOCH, STEVEN M

Attorney at GUBLER & IDE

Koch Degn & Gomez Llp 1148 N Chinowth St #B

Visalia, CA 93291

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • Docket4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer(s): Stainfield, Bryan K., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: ACCLAIM CREDIT TECHNOLOGIES; Awarded Against: CONNORS, RODNEY A.; Amount; Damages: $694.44; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $56.81; Attorney Fees: $138.88; Costs: $240.50; Total: $1130.63; Party: Names: ACCLAIM CREDIT TECHNOLOGIES; CONNORS, RODNEY A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to does 1 to 10 inclusive only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 29, 2016 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 29, 2016 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • Docket843X Pmt: Small Claims First Paper File by Assignee w/in SC - Comment: Amount of $181.00 for ACCLAIM CREDIT TECHNOLOGIES (PL-1). Received from ACCLAIM CREDIT TECHNOLOGIES, check no(s) 42113. Receipt #838298 for amount of $181.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less