This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/19/2018 at 05:07:26 (UTC).

ACCLAIM CREDIT TECHNOLOGIES VS BROWN

Case Summary

On 10/26/2015 ACCLAIM CREDIT TECHNOLOGIES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BROWN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Stainfield, Bryan K., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0177

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACCLAIM CREDIT TECHNOLOGIES

Defendants

BROWN, KRISANDRA J

BROWN, KRISANDRA JEAN

BROWN, RISANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOCH, STEVEN M

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: ACCLAIM CREDIT TECHNOLOGIES; Awarded Against: BROWN, KRISANDRA J; Amount; Damages: $8,750.11; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $2,356.54; Attorney Fees: $800.00; Costs: $374.90; Total: $12281.55; Party: Names: BROWN, KRISANDRA J; ACCLAIM CREDIT TECHNOLOGIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs and Credits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Debtor's Examination - Judicial Officer(s): Stainfield, Bryan K., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: No Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Comment: Hearing Date: 11-18-16 Hearing Time: 10:00am Department/Division: BR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer(s): Stainfield, Bryan K., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2016
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.