This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:49:07 (UTC).

ACCEPTANCE NOW, INC. VS ROBERSON

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 ACCEPTANCE NOW, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBERSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1601

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACCEPTANCE NOW, INC.

Defendant

ROBERSON, JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 06/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: ACCEPTANCE NOW, INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Req for Dism After Hearing/Trial (CS/FAM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO JUAN LOPEZ FOR ACCEPTANCE NOW INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 06/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO JOSHUA ROBERSON BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ACCEPTANCE NOW, INC.; Served: 03/23/20174:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.