Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:52:00 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS,VIII,LLC VS RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS,VIII,LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0061

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS,VIII,LLC

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, DORA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEIDARZADEH, SHAYAN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

MO - Order to Show Cause Re: 3.740 (d): Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS,VIII,LLC; Attorney: HEIDARZADEH, SHAYAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6 - Comment: Los Angeles County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6 - Comment: Los Angeles County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Los Angeles County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Sacramento County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: Accured Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - MO - Order to Show Cause Re: 3.740 (d): Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketApplication and Order for Publication of Summons - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: In Response To OSC RE: Proof of Service Set January 15, 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS,VIII,LLC; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less