Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:00:05 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS, VIII, LLC VS FUENTES

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS, VIII, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FUENTES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0961

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS, VIII, LLC

Defendant

FUENTES, GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEIDARZADEH, SHAYAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS, VIII, LLC; Awarded Against: FUENTES, GEORGE; Amount; Damages: $4,015.10; Attorney Fees: $800.00; Costs: $315.00; Total: $5130.10; Party: Names: ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS, VIII, LLC; FUENTES, GEORGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: AS TO GEORGE FUENTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: RE: ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AS TO GEORGE FUENTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to DOES 1-100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: substituted, as to George Fuentes, an individual

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SHAYAN HEIDARZADEH

    Read MoreRead Less